EP1605198 - Method for production of liquid carbon dioxide, and application for the production of supercritical carbon dioxide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states L'Air Liquide Société Anon. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boisdon, Vincent 34 avenue Albert 1er 92500, Rueil Malmaison / FR | 02 /
Winter, Harald Viktoria Strasse 72 41061, Munchengladbach / DE | 03 /
Magneney, Christophe 3 Lot de la Colline 31460, Caraman / FR | 04 /
Deretz, Olivier 4 place Maurel 31320, Castanet Tolosan / FR | 05 /
Bras, Dominique 85 rue Pierre Ronsard 93290, Tremblay en France / FR | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Mellul-Bendelac, Sylvie Lisette, et al L'Air Liquide Direction des Services De la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | Ducreux, Marie, et al L'Air Liquide S.A., Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle, 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05300449.5 | 03.06.2005 | [2005/50] | Priority number, date | FR20040006335 | 11.06.2004 Original published format: FR 0406335 | [2005/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1605198 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1605198 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F17C7/02, F17C9/00, F17C13/02 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
F17C7/02 (EP);
F17C13/025 (EP);
F17C9/00 (EP);
F17C2221/013 (EP);
F17C2223/0153 (EP);
F17C2223/036 (EP);
F17C2225/0115 (EP);
F17C2225/047 (EP);
F17C2227/0337 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2005/50] | F17C9/00, F17C13/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von flüssigem Carbondioxide, und Benutzung zur Herstellung von superkritischem Carbondioxide | [2005/50] | English: | Method for production of liquid carbon dioxide, and application for the production of supercritical carbon dioxide | [2005/50] | French: | Procédé de production de dioxyde de carbone liquide et application à la production de dioxyde de carbone supercritique | [2005/50] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/50] | 06.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/39] | 23.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 25.09.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4751822 (VIARD JEAN-PIERRE [FR]) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2781037 (MESSER FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]DE495795 (PIERRE POLARD) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US4554791 (JOHANSSON GUSTAV A [DK]); | [A]WO03067144 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR], et al); | [A]US3282305 (ANTOLAK JOHN P); | [A]US5850876 (ALLISON JAMES H [AU], et al); | [A]US5761911 (JURCIK BENJAMIN [US], et al); | [A]EP0501806 (SUPREX CORP [US]) | by applicant | US4751822 | FR2781037 |