EP1728678 - Device for unloading a container with a unidirectional movement of the container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roussel, Adrien Valery 14 bis Avenue de la Libération 65690 Barbazan Debat / FR | [2006/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/49] | Application number, filing date | 05352012.8 | 03.06.2005 | [2006/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1728678 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60P1/58 | [2006/49] | CPC: |
B60P1/58 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/33] |
Former [2006/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Entladen eines Transportbehälters mittels gleichgerichteter Bewegung | [2006/49] | English: | Device for unloading a container with a unidirectional movement of the container | [2006/49] | French: | Benne animée d'un mouvement unidirectionnel pour décharger tout produit stocké a l'intérieur de la benne | [2006/49] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Drawings {1} | 09.09.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Drawings | 07.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/10] | 18.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.08.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.08.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 01.08.2007 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE3319074 (STRAUB FRITZ) [X] 1-3 * page 6, line 19 - page 7, line 19 * * page 8, line 16 - line 26 * * page 9, line 18 - line 26 * * page 10, line 13 - line 15 * * page 12, line 14 - line 22; figure - * * claim - * [Y] 4-6; | [Y]US2500293 (O'CONNOR JOHN C) [Y] 4-6 * column 2, line 47 - line 75 * * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 4 * * column 5, line 23 - line 25; figure - *; | [A]DE1934711 (KISHASEIZO KABUSHIKI KAISHA) [A] 1-6 * page 10, line 6 - page 11, line 36; figures 8-13 *; | [A]US4793468 (HAMILTON JAMES M [US], et al) |