EP1640335 - Packaging device for electromechanical integrated microsystems and its method of fabrication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/13] | Packaging device for electromechanical integrated microsystems und its method of fabrication | ||
[2013/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, Rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/13] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31/33, Rue de la Fédération 75752 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Delapierre, Gilles 7, rue des Laboureurs 38180 Seyssins / FR | [2006/13] | Representative(s) | Hecké, Gérard, et al Cabinet Hecké 10, rue d'Arménie - Europole BP 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Hecké, Gérard, et al Cabinet Hecké 10, rue d'Arménie Europole BP 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | ||
Former [2006/13] | Jouvray, Marie-Andrée, et al Cabinet Hecké, World Trade Center - Europole, 5, place Robert Schuman, B.P. 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05354030.8 | 12.08.2005 | [2006/13] | Priority number, date | FR20040010232 | 28.09.2004 Original published format: FR 0410232 | [2006/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1640335 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1640335 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | [2007/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1640335 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B81B7/00, B81B3/00 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
B81B7/0041 (EP,US);
B81C2203/0136 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/24] |
Former [2006/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bauelement zum Verkapseln von elektromechanischen integrierten Mikrosystemen und Herstellungsverfahren | [2006/13] | English: | Packaging device for electromechanical integrated microsystems and its method of fabrication | [2013/03] | French: | Composant d'encapsulation de micro-systèmes électromécaniques intégrés et procédé de réalisation du composant | [2006/13] |
Former [2006/13] | Packaging device for electromechanical integrated microsystems und its method of fabrication | Examination procedure | 22.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 04.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 12.06.2013 | [2014/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO0158804 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * figures 1,2 * [Y] 9-11; | [Y]WO03070625 (NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORP [US], et al) [Y] 9-11 * paragraphs [0022] , [0040]; figures 2-9 *; | [DA] - AIGNER R ET AL, ""Cavity-Micromachining" technology: zero-package solution for inertial sensors", TRANSDUCERS '01. EUROSENSORS XV. 11TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SOLID-STATE SENSORS AND ACTUATORS, 10-14 JUNE 2001. DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS SPRINGER-VERLAG, BERLIN, GERMANY, (2001), vol. 1, ISBN 3-540-42150-5, pages 186 - 189 vol.1, XP001205670 [DA] 1 * figures 1,2 * | [A] - STARK B H ET AL, "A LOW-TEMPERATURE THIN-FILM ELECTROPLATED METAL VACUUM PACKAGE", JOURNAL OF MICROELECTROMECHANICAL SYSTEMS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (200404), vol. 13, no. 2, ISSN 1057-7157, pages 147 - 157, XP001200235 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JMEMS.2004.825301 | [A] - JEN-YI CHEN ET AL, "A novel device-level micropackaging using micro assembly transfer", MICRO-ELECTRO-MECHANICAL SYSTEMS (MEMS). 2001 ASME INTERNATIONAL MECHANICAL ENGINEERING CONGRESS AND EXPOSITION, NOV. 11-16, NEW YORK, NY, USA, (2001), ISBN 0-7918-3555-3, pages 769 - 774, XP009046230 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | [A] - CHANG-HYUN BAE ET AL, "Fabrication of cylinder type micro channel using photoresist reflow and isotropic etching", MICROPROCESSES AND NANOTECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 2003. DIGEST OF PAPERS. 2003 INTERNATIONAL OCT. 29-31, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20031029), ISBN 4-89114-040-2, pages 200 - 201, XP010684646 [A] 9-12 * figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IMNC.2003.1268707 | by applicant | WO0158804 | WO03070625 |