EP1704916 - A contact filter block and a method and an apparatus for producing tubular elements of a contact filter block [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2007 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Expo-Net Danmark A/S Georg Jensens Vej 5 9800 Hjorring / DK | [2006/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klinkby, John Urdsvej 19 9800 Hjo̸rring / DK | [2006/39] | Representative(s) | Nielsen, Henrik Sten, et al Budde Schou A/S Hausergade 3 1128 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Nielsen, Henrik Sten, et al Budde Schou A/S Vester So̸gade 10 1601 Copenhagen V / DK | ||
Former [2006/39] | Nielsen, Henrik Sten, et al Budde, Schou & Ostenfeld A/S Vester Sögade 10 1601 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 05388027.4 | 23.03.2005 | [2006/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1704916 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/32, C02F3/10, B29C47/12, B29C47/24, B29C47/26, B29C47/38, B29C47/82, B29C47/88 | [2006/39] | CPC: |
C02F3/101 (EP,US);
B29C48/05 (EP,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,US);
B29C48/12 (EP,US);
B29C48/13 (EP,US);
B29C48/33 (EP,US);
B29C48/345 (EP,US);
B01D2239/10 (EP);
B29C48/04 (EP,US);
B29C48/10 (EP,US);
B29C48/18 (EP,US);
B29L2028/00 (EP);
Y02W10/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/22] |
Former [2006/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kontaktfilterblock und Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von rohrförmigen Elementen für einen Kontaktfilterblock | [2006/39] | English: | A contact filter block and a method and an apparatus for producing tubular elements of a contact filter block | [2006/39] | French: | Bloc de filtres de contact et procédé de production des éléments tubulaires pour un bloc de filtres de contact | [2006/39] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/52] | 25.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.05.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.05.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.05.2007 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS559848 ; | [A]JPS559847 ; | [A]US3758359 (AZUMA K) [A] 2,3 * figures 3,4 *; | [Y]US4083667 (LIVINGSTON WAYNE W, et al) [Y] 2,3 * abstract *; | [A]US5772870 (BASSE HARTWIG [DE]) [A] 1,13,14 * abstract *; | [AD]US5882510 (BASSE HARTWIG [DE], et al) [AD] 1,14 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1142837 (NORDDEUTSCHE SEEKABELWERK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-3,11,14 * abstract * * column 7, lines 39-41; figure 4 *; | [AD]US2004022973 (BUSSEY HARRY [US], et al) [AD] 1* abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800327), vol. 004, no. 037, Database accession no. (M - 004), & JP55009848 A 19800124 (JAPAN STYRENE PAPER CO LTD) [Y] 1,11,14 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800327), vol. 004, no. 037, Database accession no. (M - 004), & JP55009847 A 19800124 (JAPAN STYRENE PAPER CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |