Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
06.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] |
01.04.2014 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
13.01.2014 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
27.12.2013 | Definitive list of designations | published on 29.01.2014 [2014/05] |
10.05.2013 | Change - representative | published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] |
19.04.2013 | Publication of search report | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
19.04.2013 | Change - classification | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
19.04.2013 | Change - classification | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
22.02.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.01.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.02.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.01.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.02.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.02.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.02.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.08.2005 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] |