EP1655598 - System, method, and product for multiple wavelength detection using single source excitation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Affymetrix, Inc. 3380 Central Expressway Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | [2006/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lennhoff, Akim F. 192 Larch Road Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | 02 /
Weiner, Nathan K. 3 Miscoe Hill Road Upton, MA 01568 / US | [2006/19] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2006/19] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05400035.1 | 29.10.2005 | [2006/19] | Priority number, date | US20040623390P | 29.10.2004 Original published format: US 623390 P | [2006/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1655598 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1655598 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
G01N21/6428 (EP,US);
G01N21/6452 (EP,US);
G01N21/6456 (EP,US);
G01N33/582 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6825 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6419 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/19] | Title | German: | System, Verfahren und Produkt für mehrfache Wellenlängendetektion unter Verwendung einer einzigen Anregungsquelle | [2006/19] | English: | System, method, and product for multiple wavelength detection using single source excitation | [2006/19] | French: | Système, procédé et produit pour la détection de multiples longueurs d'onde au moyen d'une source d'excitation unique | [2006/19] | Examination procedure | 04.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 12.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/25] | 25.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.04.2007 | M01   Fee paid on   04.05.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004012676 (WEINER NATHAN K [US], et al); | [X]US2004061071 (DORSEL ANDREAS N [US]) | by applicant | US4437975 | US4683202 | US4683195 | WO8810315 | US4800159 | WO9006995 | US4965188 | US4988617 | US5143854 | US5242974 | US5242794 | US5252743 | US5324633 | US5333675 | US5384261 | US5405783 | US5409818 | US5412087 | US5413909 | US5424186 | US5451683 | US5482867 | US5491074 | US5494810 | US5527681 | US5541061 | US5547839 | US5550215 | US5554517 | US5571639 | US5578832 | US5593839 | US5599695 | US5624711 | US5631734 | US5733729 | US5744305 | US5795716 | US5800992 | US5831070 | US5834758 | US5837832 | US5856101 | US5856092 | US5858659 | US5861245 | US5871928 | US5874219 | US5889165 | US5902723 | WO9936760 | US5936324 | US5945334 | WO9947964 | US5959098 | US5968740 | US5974164 | US5981185 | US5981956 | US6013449 | US6020135 | US6025601 | US6033860 | US6040193 | US6040138 | US6045996 | US6063603 | US6066454 | US6090555 | WO0058516 | US6136269 | US6141096 | US6147205 | US6171793 | US6177248 | US6185030 | US6185561 | US6188783 | US6197506 | US6201639 | US6207960 | US6218803 | US6223127 | US6225625 | US6228593 | US6229911 | US6242180 | US6252236 | US6262216 | US6268490 | US6269846 | WO0158593 | US6284460 | US6287850 | US6300063 | US6300070 | US6308170 | US6310189 | US6309822 | US6333179 | US6335824 | US2002024026 | US2002025082 | US6361947 | US6361937 | US6368799 | WO0237209 | US6386749 | US2002059326 | US6391592 | US6391623 | US6399365 | US6403320 | US6407858 | US6410276 | US6420108 | US6428752 | US6472671 | US2002168094 | US6484183 | US2002175949 | US6490533 | US2002183936 | US6505125 | US6510391 | US2003036069 | US2003036087 | US6532462 | US6546340 | US6551817 | US2003082543 | US2003096235 | US2003097222 | US2003100995 | US6582938 | US6582908 | US2003120432 | US6643015 | US6650411 | US2004002818 | US2004012676 | US6687692 | US2004049354 | US2004126840 | US2004220897 | US2005001176 | US2005059062 | US2005074787 | US2007065816 | US2007226742 | US19950004934 | US20030482389 | US20030493950 | US20120004838 | US20000513300 | US20010916135 | US20040826577 |