Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8154311 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2012 | B2 | US2007285109 | 13.12.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006CH00037 | 17.01.2006 | EP05405031 | 21.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0606482 | 30.06.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006CH00037 | 17.01.2006 | EP05405031 | 21.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2601321 | 03.03.2015 | C | CA2601321 | 27.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006CH00037 | 17.01.2006 | EP05405031 | 21.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101107533B | 08.09.2010 | B | CN101107533 | 16.01.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006CH00037 | 17.01.2006 | EP05405031 | 21.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20074246L | 22.10.2007 | L | Priority number | Date | WO2006CH00037 | 17.01.2006 | EP05405031 | 21.01.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006076824 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP05405031 | 21.01.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1684081 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2017 | B1 | EP1684081 | 26.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP05405031 | 21.01.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2638765T | 24.10.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP05405031 | 21.01.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2383027 | 27.02.2010 | C2 | RU2007131587 | 27.02.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | EP05405031 | 21.01.2005 |