EP1684081 - Method and device for characterizing the linear properties of an electrical component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Research Ltd Affolternstrasse 52 8050 Zürich / CH | [2017/24] |
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states ABB Research Ltd Affolternastrasse 52 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niayesh, Kaveh Sonnrainweg 1 5430 Wettingen / CH | 02 /
Berth, Matthias Waffenplatzstrasse 80 8002 Zürich / CH | 03 /
Dahlquist, Andreas Hofwiesenstrasse 262 8050 Zürich / CH | 04 /
Tiberg, Martin Kronengasse 2 5400 Baden / CH | 05 /
Heitz, Christoph Schulweg 2 8353 Elgg/ZH / CH | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2017/24] | ABB Patent Attorneys c/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2006/30] | ABB Patent Attorneys c/o ABB Schweiz AG, Intellectual Property (CH-LC/IP), Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 05405031.5 | 21.01.2005 | [2006/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1684081 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1684081 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01R27/28 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
G01R27/28 (EP,US);
Y02E60/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/24] |
Former [2006/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Charakterisierung der linearen Eigenschaften einer elektrischen Komponente | [2006/30] | English: | Method and device for characterizing the linear properties of an electrical component | [2006/30] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour caractériser les propriétés linéaires d'un composant électrique | [2006/30] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 22.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.01.2005 | AT | 14.06.2017 | CY | 14.06.2017 | CZ | 14.06.2017 | DK | 14.06.2017 | EE | 14.06.2017 | FI | 14.06.2017 | IT | 14.06.2017 | LT | 14.06.2017 | MC | 14.06.2017 | NL | 14.06.2017 | PL | 14.06.2017 | PT | 14.06.2017 | RO | 14.06.2017 | SE | 14.06.2017 | SI | 14.06.2017 | SK | 14.06.2017 | TR | 14.06.2017 | BG | 14.09.2017 | GR | 15.09.2017 | IS | 14.10.2017 | IE | 21.01.2018 | LU | 21.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 21.01.2005 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PT | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 21.01.2018 | ||
LU | 21.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 21.01.2018 | ||
LU | 21.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 21.01.2018 | ||
LU | 21.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 21.01.2018 | ||
LU | 21.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
LU | 21.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
LU | 21.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
LU | 21.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | FI | 14.06.2017 | |
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 14.06.2017 | |
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 14.06.2017 | |
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4156842 (BROOKS JAMES L [US], et al) [X] 10-12 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 42 * * column 4, line 13 - line 28 * * column 6, line 60 - column 7, line 13 *; | [A]EP0443835 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,2,9,10 * figures 1-7 * * page 2, line 36 - page 3, line 15 ** claims 1,6,8 *; | [A]US6054867 (WAKAMATSU HIDEKI [JP]) [A] 1,2,9,10 * figures 2,6,8 *; | [XA] - AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES, "Agilent 4155C/4156C Semiconductor Parameter Analyzer User's Guide , Edition 1", AGILENT MANUALS, (200101), vol. 1, pages 1.1-1.20,2.41-2.46,4.39,4.41,7.19 - 7.25, XP002334387 [X] 10-12 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,9 | [XA] - SI. FANG, Electrical Modeling of Main Injector Dipole Magnets, FERMI NATIONAL ACCELERATOR LABORATORY, (19950317), XP002334389 [X] 10-12 * figures 1,2 * * page 1 - page 2 * [A] 1,2,6,9 | [X] - GUILLAUME P ET AL, "Parametric identification of two-port models in the frequency domain", INSTRUMENTATION AND MEASUREMENT TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE. ATLANTA, MAY 14, (19910514), vol. CONF. 8, ISBN 0-87942-579-2, pages 263 - 271, XP010036959 [X] 10-12 * figure 2 * * abstract * * page 263, paragraph I.INTRODUCTION * * page 267, paragraph VIII.CONCLUSIONS * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IMTC.1991.161590 | [A] - SCHLAGENHAUFOR F ET AL, "Using N-port models for the analysis of radiating structures", 2002 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON ELECTROMAGNETIC COMPATIBILITY. EMC. SYMPOSIUM RECORD. MINNEAPOLIS, MN, AUG. 19 - 23, 2002, INTERNATIONL SYMPOSIUM ON ELECTROMAGNETIC COMPATIBILITY, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20020819), VOL. 1 OF 2, ISBN 0-7803-7264-6, pages 297 - 302, XP010603241 [A] 1,2,9,10 * figure 1 * * page 297, paragraphs N-PORT.BASICS-THEORY * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISEMC.2002.1032492 |