EP1688056 - Bracelet fastener [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bouille, Eric La Marnière 57 2068 Hauterive / CH | [2006/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/32] | Representative(s) | Bovard SA Neuchâtel Rue des Noyers 11 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/32] | GLN Rue du Puits-Godet 8a 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 05405055.4 | 04.02.2005 | [2006/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1688056 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A44C5/14 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
A44C5/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2007/16] |
Former [2006/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Armbandverschluss | [2006/32] | English: | Bracelet fastener | [2006/32] | French: | Attache de bracelet | [2006/32] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/43] | 06.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.03.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.03.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.03.2007 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB933969 (THEODOR ENGELHARD, et al) [X] 1,3-5 * page 2, line 60 - line 61 * * page 2, line 69 - line 70 * * page 2, line 78 - line 80 * * page 2, line 88 - line 91; figure 2 * [Y] 2; | [Y]US4231502 (MEYERSON STANLEY) [Y] 2 * column 4, line 31 - line 42; figure 3 *; | [X]GB2114643 (LAI FU HONG) [X] 1 * page 1, line 40 * * page 2, line 91 - line 106 * * page 2, line 115 - line 116 * * page 3, line 13 - line 30 *; | [X]DE2709955 (BUERKLE FRITZ METALLWAREN) [X] 1,4 * page 13, paragraph 5 - page 14, paragraph 1 * * page 15, paragraph 3 * * page 16, paragraph 4 *; | [A]DE1098755 (KARL HEINRICH HEINZ) [A] 1,6 * column 2, line 23 - line 28 * * column 3, line 19 - line 23 * * column 3, line 29 - line 30; figure 2 * |