blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1609540

EP1609540 - Process for treating a tube to be cleaned [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.06.2008
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.07.2008  [2008/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Adisa Service und Entwicklungs AG
Lerzenstrasse 12
8953 Dietikon / CH
[2005/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Bachmann, Werner
c/o Adisa Service und Entw. AG Lerzenstrasse 12
8953 Dietikon / CH
 [2005/52]
Representative(s)Walder, Martin Bernhard, et al
Riederer Hasler & Partner Patentanwälte AG Elestastrasse 8
7310 Bad Ragaz / CH
[2005/52]
Application number, filing date05405388.916.06.2005
[2005/52]
Priority number, dateCH2004000107125.06.2004         Original published format: CH 10712004
[2005/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1609540
Date:28.12.2005
Language:DE
[2005/52]
ClassificationIPC:B08B9/027, B08B9/043, B24C3/32, E03B7/09, F16L58/10, G01M3/00
[2005/52]
CPC:
B08B9/032 (EP); B08B9/0321 (EP); B08B9/0436 (EP);
B24C3/327 (EP); E03B7/006 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/52]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Behandlung einer zu reinigenden Rohrleitung[2005/52]
English:Process for treating a tube to be cleaned[2005/52]
French:Procédé de traitement d'un tube à nettoyer[2005/52]
Examination procedure03.01.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/28]
14.02.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2008/28]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200703   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.