EP1777147 - Stiffening element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcan Technology & Management Ltd. Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [2007/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Behre, Kurt Im Grünen Tal 24 49078 Osnabrück / DE | 02 /
Klenke, Detlev Falkenring 29 49134 Wallenhorst / DE | 03 /
Walsch, Thomas Goethestrasse 4C 49525 Lengerich / DE | 04 /
Seidel, Siegfried Martin-Luther-Strasse 17 49205 Hasbergen / DE | [2007/17] | Application number, filing date | 05405588.4 | 18.10.2005 | [2007/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1777147 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B62D29/04, B62D25/06, B60R13/02, B32B27/00 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
B60R13/0815 (EP,US);
B32B5/02 (EP);
B62D25/06 (EP);
B62D29/043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/17] | Title | German: | Versteifungskörper | [2007/17] | English: | Stiffening element | [2007/17] | French: | Elément de renforcement | [2007/17] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 26.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/14] | 15.11.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO9727998 (GOR APPLIC SPECIALI SRL [IT]) [Y] 5-10 * abstract * * page 1, line 20 - page 4, line 6 * * page 7, line 15 - page 8, line 20 * [A] 1-4,10,11; | [XDA]EP0825066 (BENECKE KALIKO AG [DE]) [XD] 1-4,11,12 * figure .; claims 1,4,5 * [A] 10; | [XA]EP1319554 (ALCAN TECH & MAN AG [CH]) [X] 1-4 * figure -; claims 1,3,4,6 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0012] , [0013] * [A] 10; | [A]WO2004011300 (FLEXFORM TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [A] 1-12* page 3, line 14 - line 27 *; | [XY]EP1531116 (INTIER AUTOMOTIVE INTERIORS ZI [ES]) [X] 1-4,11,12 * column A; figure -; claims 1,2,4,5 * * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0008] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0023] * [Y] 5-10 | by applicant | EP0825068 | WO0126878 |