EP1698980 - A method for managing data exchange in the avionic system of an aircraft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Galileo Avionica S.p.A. Via A. Einstein 35 50013 Campi Bisenzio (Firenze) / IT | [2006/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rinaldi, Pier Paolo Via Casale, 143-2 10099 San Mauro Torinese / IT | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2006/36] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 05425123.6 | 04.03.2005 | [2006/36] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1698980 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, H04L12/40 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
H04L41/046 (EP,US);
H04L41/00 (US);
H04L41/0226 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/19] |
Former [2006/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verwaltung von Datenaustausch in dem Luftfahrtsystem eines Flugzeugs | [2006/36] | English: | A method for managing data exchange in the avionic system of an aircraft | [2006/36] | French: | Procédé de gestion pour échanger des données dans la système avionique d'un avion | [2006/36] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/49] | 10.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.04.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.04.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.04.2007 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6324655 (MATOBA TATSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * figures 1-5B; claims 1-69 * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 16 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 46 * * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 40 * * column 11, line 56 - column 12, line 6 *; | [X]EP1191747 (NAT INSTR CORP [US]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 8 - page 3, paragraph 12 * * page 5, paragraph 30 - paragraph 31 * * page 6, paragraph 39 - paragraph 42 * * page 6, paragraph 44 - page 7, paragraph 47 * * page 8, paragraph 58 - paragraph 59 * * page 10, paragraph 80 - page 13, paragraph 104 * * page 13, paragraph 105 - paragraph 106 * * page 13, paragraph 107 - paragraph 110 * * page 14, paragraph 112 - paragraph 115 * * page 14, paragraph 116 - page 16, paragraph 138 * * claims 1-24,31,37 * * figures 2,3,5-14 *; | [X] - F. BUSCHMANN, R. MEUNIER, H. ROHNERT, P. SOMMERLAD, M. STAHL, Pattern-Oriented Software Architecture Vol. 1 A System of Patterns, GREAT BRITAIN, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (19960930), XP002347430 [X] 1-13 * page 277, paragraph 1 - page 290, paragraph L * * page 277, paragraph 1 * * page 277, paragraph L * * page 278, paragraph 1 - paragraph L * * page 279, paragraph 1 - page 280, paragraph L * * page 282, paragraph 1 - page 287, paragraph L * * page 288, paragraph 1 - page 289, paragraph 6 * | [X] - D. SCHMIDT, M. STAHL, H. ROHNERT, F. BUSCHMANN, Pattern-Oriented Software Architecture Vol. 2 Patterns for Concurrent and Networked Objects, GREAT BRITAIN, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (20000131), XP002347431 [X] 1-13 * page 399, paragraph 1 - page 422, paragraph L * | [A] - BOSCH, "CAN Specification, version 2.0", BOSCH CAN SPECIFICATION VERSION 2.0, (1991), pages 1 - 72, XP002219808 [A] 1-13 * page 4, paragraph 1 - page 5, paragraph L * * page 6, paragraph 6 - paragraph 10 * * page 7, paragraph 2 - paragraph L * * page 8, paragraph 5 - paragraph 7 * * page 10, paragraph 1 - page 18, paragraph 4 * | [A] - TURPIN B, "Advanced Synchronization Techniques for Data Acquisition", NATIONAL INSTRUMENTS. APPLICATION NOTE, (199810), no. 128, pages 1 - 14, XP002246106 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |