EP1739017 - Apparatus for filling bearing balls into containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.02.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.04.2008 [2008/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EUROBALL S.P.A. Galleria San Federico, 54 10121 Torino / IT | [2007/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAMBA, Carlo Piazza Sabin, 3 10064 Pinerolo / IT | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Bongiovanni, Simone, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | Bongiovanni, Simone, et al Studio Torta S.r.l Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 05425469.3 | 30.06.2005 | [2007/01] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1739017 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65B1/06, B65B43/54, B65B57/06, B65B59/00, B65B43/50, B65B57/20 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
B65B1/06 (EP);
B65B59/003 (EP,US);
B65B25/00 (EP);
B65B43/50 (EP);
B65B43/60 (EP);
B65B5/101 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/36] |
Former [2007/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Füllen von Lagerkugeln in Behälter | [2007/01] | English: | Apparatus for filling bearing balls into containers | [2007/01] | French: | Dispositif de remplissage de billes de roulement dans des récipients | [2007/01] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/14] | 14.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2661881 (KASPER CASS S) [X] 1-3 * column 8, line 31 - column 9, line 17; figure 1 *; | [XY]US4071998 (MEADOWS FLOYD G) [X] 1,3-5 * the whole document * [Y] 6; | [Y]US4778045 (GRUENE HELMUT [DE], et al) [Y] 6* abstract * |