EP1788294 - Fitting with device to indicate the attainment of a pre-established pressure level when tightening. To be used in particular for connecting pipes nade of pliable materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rezza, Antonino V. le Cavarretta n. 28 90151 Palermo (Sicilia) / IT | [2007/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/21] | Application number, filing date | 05425808.2 | 16.11.2005 | [2007/21] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1788294 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16L33/22 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
F16L33/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/05] |
Former [2007/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rohrverbindung, ausgestattet mit einer Anzeigevorrichtung zur Angabe eines voreingestellten Verschlussdruckes, besonders geeignet für die Verbindung von Rohren aus nachgiebigen Materialien | [2007/21] | English: | Fitting with device to indicate the attainment of a pre-established pressure level when tightening. To be used in particular for connecting pipes nade of pliable materials | [2007/21] | French: | Raccord, équipé d'une pompe à niveau pour indiquer la pression à atteindre, spécialement conçu pour des raccordements de tuyaux en matière malléable | [2007/21] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 04.05.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 24.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/21] | 08.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR559074 (CIE INGERSOLL RAND) [X] 1,3-18,22,23 * figure - *; | [X]FR999256 (M.J. LAURET) [X] 1,6,20,22,23 * figure - *; | [X]US4666192 (ZAMORA PEDRO C [ES]) [X] 1,2,4,5,21 * abstract *; | [X]DE3830241 (KATZENSTEINER JOSEF [AT]) [X] 1* abstract *; | [X]WO0120216 (SCHLEMMER GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,4-7,10-13,16-19 * abstract *; | [X]DE10046554 (MUENSTER INNOVATIONEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,7-9,22 * abstract * |