EP1712914 - In vitro process and kit for the simultaneous detection and identification of antibiotics belonging to different classes. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unisensor S.A. Liège Science Park, Allée des Noisetiers 6 4031 Angleur / BE | [2006/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Granier, Benoît Route de Bonsgnée 145 4120 Rotheux-Rimiere / BE | [2006/42] | Representative(s) | Van Malderen, Michel, et al Office van Malderen 85/043 Boulevard de la Sauvenière 4000 Liège / BE | [2006/42] | Application number, filing date | 05447079.4 | 14.04.2005 | [2006/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1712914 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/544, G01N33/558 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
G01N33/9446 (EP,US);
G01N33/54388 (EP,US);
G01N2415/00 (EP,US);
Y10S436/81 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/26] |
Former [2006/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | In vitro-Prozess zur gleichzeitigen Ermittlung und Identifizierung von Antibiotika verschiedener Klassen sowie Reagenzienkit zu dessen Durchführung. | [2006/42] | English: | In vitro process and kit for the simultaneous detection and identification of antibiotics belonging to different classes. | [2006/42] | French: | Procédé in vitro pour la detection et l'identification simultanées d'antibiotiques de classes differentes et trousse de diagnostic correspondante | [2006/42] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/02] | 21.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/02] | 14.11.2007 | Observations by third parties | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.05.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.05.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 29.05.2007 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4762782 (GOLDBERG EDWARD B [US], et al); | [YA]US5648213 (REDDY M PARAMESWARA [US], et al); | [XA]WO9967416 (UCB BIOPRODUCTS [BE]); | [YA]US6498010 (FITZGERALD STEPHEN PETER [GB], et al); | by applicant | EP0593112 | US5434053 | WO9967416 | US6475805 | US6524804 | WO03048770 |