Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AT8046U | 15.01.2006 | U1 | Priority number | Date | AT7952004 | 04.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202005020926U | 11.01.2007 | U1 | Priority number | Date | EP05450179 | 03.11.2005 | AT11882005 | 14.07.2005 | AT7952004 | 04.11.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1655082T | 30.11.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP05450179 | 03.11.2005 | AT11882005 | 14.07.2005 | AT7952004 | 04.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1655082 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2007 | B1 | EP1655082 | 10.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT11882005 | 14.07.2005 | AT7952004 | 04.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AT500610B | 15.02.2006 | B1 | AT500610 | 15.02.2006 | A4 | Priority number | Date | AT11882005 | 14.07.2005 | AT7952004 | 04.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE364455T | 15.07.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | AT11882005 | 14.07.2005 | AT7952004 | 04.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502005000854D1 | 26.07.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | AT11882005 | 14.07.2005 | AT7952004 | 04.11.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2289685T | 01.02.2008 | T3 | Priority number | Date | AT11882005 | 14.07.2005 | AT7952004 | 04.11.2004 |