EP1655082 - Process and apparatus for cleaning workpieces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/19] | Process for cleaning workpieces | ||
[2007/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU, TR | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Knoth Automation GmbH Engerthstrasse 86 1200 Wien / AT | [2006/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knoth, Hubert, Ing. Hungerbergerstrasse 18 1190 Wien / AT | 02 /
Knoth-Bambule, Rudolf Hungerbergerstrasse 18 1190 Wien / AT | [2006/19] | Representative(s) | Babeluk, Michael Patentanwalt Florianigasse 26/3 1080 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | Babeluk, Michael Patentanwalt, Mariahilfer Gürtel 39/17 1150 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 05450179.6 | 03.11.2005 | [2006/19] | Priority number, date | AT20040000795 | 04.11.2004 Original published format: AT 7952004 | AT20050001188 | 14.07.2005 Original published format: AT 11882005 | [2006/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1655082 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1655082 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B08B5/02 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
B08B5/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Reinigung von Werkstücken | [2007/12] | English: | Process and apparatus for cleaning workpieces | [2007/12] | French: | Pocédé et appareil de nettoyage de pièces industrielles | [2007/12] |
Former [2006/19] | Verfahren zur Reinigung von Werkstücken | ||
Former [2006/19] | Process for cleaning workpieces | ||
Former [2006/19] | Pocédé de nettoyage de pièces industrielles | Examination procedure | 08.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 27.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.06.2007 | DK | 13.06.2007 | EE | 13.06.2007 | FI | 13.06.2007 | GB | 13.06.2007 | IE | 13.06.2007 | IT | 13.06.2007 | LT | 13.06.2007 | LV | 13.06.2007 | NL | 13.06.2007 | RO | 13.06.2007 | SI | 13.06.2007 | TR | 13.06.2007 | BG | 13.09.2007 | GR | 14.09.2007 | IS | 13.10.2007 | AT | 03.11.2007 | LU | 03.11.2007 | PT | 13.11.2007 | BE | 30.11.2007 | MC | 30.11.2007 | FR | 08.02.2008 | [2009/48] |
Former [2009/15] | DK | 13.06.2007 | |
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
LT | 13.06.2007 | ||
LV | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
IS | 13.10.2007 | ||
AT | 03.11.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
FR | 08.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | DK | 13.06.2007 | |
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
LT | 13.06.2007 | ||
LV | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
IS | 13.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
FR | 08.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | DK | 13.06.2007 | |
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
LT | 13.06.2007 | ||
LV | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
IS | 13.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
FR | 08.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/32] | DK | 13.06.2007 | |
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
LT | 13.06.2007 | ||
LV | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
IS | 13.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
FR | 08.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | DK | 13.06.2007 | |
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
LT | 13.06.2007 | ||
LV | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
IS | 13.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | DK | 13.06.2007 | |
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
LT | 13.06.2007 | ||
LV | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
IS | 13.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | DK | 13.06.2007 | |
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
LT | 13.06.2007 | ||
LV | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
IS | 13.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | GB | 13.06.2007 | |
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
LT | 13.06.2007 | ||
LV | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
IS | 13.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | IE | 13.06.2007 | |
LT | 13.06.2007 | ||
LV | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
IS | 13.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | SI | 13.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]DE4127982 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,3-9,11 * abstract * * page 1, column 49 - page 5, column 59 * * page 9, line 25 - line 62 * [A] 13,15 [Y] 2,12,14; | [Y]US5293663 (MCCULLOUGH TIMOTHY J [US]) [Y] 2 * abstract ** column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 2 *; | [XY]DE19532576 (GROSS HANS HERMANN DIPL ING [DE]) [X] 1,3,4 * figure - * * column 2, line 52 - column 4, line 30 * [Y] 12,14 | by applicant | DE2936779 | EP0158904 | US4808234 |