EP1740028 - Printed circuit board with RF connector and method for attaching RF connector to printed circuit board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Digital Broadcast S.A. Impasse Colombelle, 8 1218 Grand-Saconnex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states ADVANCED DIGITAL BROADCAST S.A. Impasse Colombelle, 8 1218 Grand-Saconnex / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cichonski, Dariusz ul. Jaskolcza 2/5 65-001 Zielona Gora / PL | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Hudy, Ludwik Kancelaria Patentowa Patelha Czernichow 4 32-070 Czernichow, Krakow / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | Hudy, Ludwik Kancelaria Patentowa Patelha Czernichow 4 32-070 Czernichow, Krakow / PL | Application number, filing date | 05460017.6 | 28.06.2005 | [2007/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1740028 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/34, H01R13/646, H01R13/658 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
H01R24/50 (EP);
H01R13/6594 (EP);
H05K1/0243 (EP);
H01R2103/00 (EP);
H01R2201/02 (EP);
H05K2201/10189 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/36] |
Former [2007/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Leiterplatte mit RF-Übergang und Verfahren zur Montage des RF-Übergangs an einer Leiterplatte | [2007/01] | English: | Printed circuit board with RF connector and method for attaching RF connector to printed circuit board | [2007/01] | French: | Circuit imprimé avec connecteur fréquence radio et méthode de montage du connecteur fréquence radio sur le circuit imprimé | [2007/01] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/13] | 31.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4799901 (PIRC DOUGLAS J [US]) [X] 1-7 * column 4, line 48 - line 63 *; | [A]US5336098 (ZELL KARL [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * claim 1 *; | [X]US5473109 (PLANKL CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [X] 1-7 * column 3, line 37 - line 41 *; | [A]US5500788 (LONGUEVILLE JACQUES [BE], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 4, line 39 - line 43 *; | [DA]EP1075170 (FORD MOTOR CO [US]) [DA] 1-7* abstract *; | [DA]EP1246517 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1-7 * abstract * | by applicant | US6140977 | EP1246517 |