EP1711104 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ECG-DERIVED SLEEP DISORDERED BREATHING MONITORING, DETECTION AND CLASSIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compumedics Limited 30-40 Flockhart Street Abbotsford, Victoria 3067 / AU | [2014/11] |
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states Compumedics Limited 30-40 Flockhart Street Abbotsford, Victoria 3067 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURTON, David 62 Broadway Camberwell, Victoria 3124 / AU | [2006/42] | Representative(s) | Handsome I.P. Ltd 27-28 Monmouth Street Bath BA1 2AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Hands, Lewis Roger, et al Handsome I.P. Ltd 3 Chapel Row Queen Square Bath BA1 1HN / GB | ||
Former [2012/13] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/39] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2006/42] | Frost, Alex John Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 05700068.9 | 14.01.2005 | [2006/42] | WO2005AU00036 | Priority number, date | AU20040900177 | 16.01.2004 Original published format: AU 2004900177 | [2006/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005067790 | Date: | 28.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1711104 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1711104 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 28.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/0472, A61B5/0402 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
A61B5/02405 (EP,US);
A61B5/366 (EP,US);
A61B5/4035 (EP,US);
A61B5/412 (EP,US);
A61B5/4812 (EP,US);
A61B5/4815 (EP,US);
A61B5/4818 (EP,US);
A61B5/7264 (EP,US);
A61B5/7207 (EP,US);
G16H50/20 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT FÜR DIE EKG-ÜBERWACHUNG VON ATMUNGSSTÖRUNGEN IM SCHLAF, NACHWEIS UND KLASSIFIKATION | [2006/42] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ECG-DERIVED SLEEP DISORDERED BREATHING MONITORING, DETECTION AND CLASSIFICATION | [2006/42] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE SURVEILLER, DE DETECTER ET DE CLASSIFIER DES TROUBLES RESPIRATOIRES DU SOMMEIL A PARTIR D'UN ELECTROCARDIOGRAMME | [2013/28] |
Former [2006/42] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE SURVEILLER DE DETECTER ET DE CLASSIFIER DES TROUBLES RESPIRATOIRES DU SOMMEIL A PARTIR D'UN ELECTROCARDIOGRAMME | Entry into regional phase | 15.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 15.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 15.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 15.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 08.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.03.2007 | 31.01.2009 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   06.07.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.01.2005 | AT | 12.03.2014 | BE | 12.03.2014 | CY | 12.03.2014 | CZ | 12.03.2014 | DK | 12.03.2014 | EE | 12.03.2014 | ES | 12.03.2014 | FI | 12.03.2014 | IT | 12.03.2014 | LT | 12.03.2014 | MC | 12.03.2014 | PL | 12.03.2014 | RO | 12.03.2014 | SE | 12.03.2014 | SI | 12.03.2014 | SK | 12.03.2014 | TR | 12.03.2014 | BG | 12.06.2014 | GR | 13.06.2014 | IS | 12.07.2014 | PT | 14.07.2014 | [2017/40] |
Former [2016/28] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/43] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 12.03.2014 | |
BE | 12.03.2014 | ||
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | BE | 12.03.2014 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 12.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0191631 (LEWIS RICHARD HAMILTON [AU]) [Y] 1-4,13-17,27 * page 10, line 25 - line 28 *; | [A]US6411843 (ZARYCHTA JAROSLAW [CA]) [A] 1,10-12,14,23,24* paragraphs [0046] , [0047] *; | [E]EP1645306 (JMS CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1,4,13,14,17,18,20-22 * paragraph [0009]; claim 17 *; | [XA] - ZYWIETZ C ET AL, "Polysomnographic sleep recording with simultaneously acquired 12 lead ecgs: a study for detection and validation of apnea related ecg changes", COMPUTERS IN CARDIOLOGY 2002. MEMPHIS, TN, SEPT. 22 - 25, 2002; [COMPUTERS IN CARDIOLOGY], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20020922), VOL. 29, ISBN 978-0-7803-7735-6, pages 573 - 576, XP010624217 [X] 1,4,6,13,14,17-20,27 * page 576, column 2, line 19 - line 22 * [A] 12,25,26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CIC.2002.1166837 | [YA] - MAZZANTI B ET AL, "Validation of an ECG-derived respiration monitoring method", COMPUTERS IN CARDIOLOGY 2003. THESSALONIKI, GREECE, SEPT. 21 - 24, 2003; [COMPUTERS IN CARDIOLOGY], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20030921), VOL. 30, ISBN 978-0-7803-8170-4, pages 613 - 616, XP010698979 [Y] 1-4,13-17,27 * sections '1. Introduction' and '4. Conclusions' * [A] 10-12,23-26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CIC.2003.1291230 | International search | [X]US5769084 (KATZ RICHARD A [US], et al); | [X]US6415174 (BEHBEHANI KHOSROW [US], et al); | [A]US5458137 (AXE JOHN R [US], et al) | [X] - NAZERAN ET AL, "Computer-Based Analysis of Heart Rate Variability Signal for Detection of Sleep Disordered Breathing in Children.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 25TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IEEE EBMS., (20030917), pages 338 - 341, XP010693205 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IEMBS.2003.1279639 | [X] - VIJENDRA ET AL, "Frequency Domain Analysis of Heart Rate Variability in Sleep Disordered Breathing.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 25TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IEEE EBMS., (20030917), pages 208 - 211, XP010693137 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IEMBS.2003.1279572 | [X] - KISTAS ET AL, "Short-Term Analysis of Heart Rate Variability Using Wavelet Packets: An Efficient Detector of Sleep Apnea Episodes.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2ND JOINT EMBS/BEMS CONFERENCE., (20021023), pages 88 - 89, XP010621222 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IEMBS.2002.1134401 | [X] - CHAZAL ET AL, "Automated Processing of the Single Lead SG for the Detection of Obstructive Sleep Apnea.", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING., (20030606), vol. 50, no. 6, pages 686 - 696, XP011097424 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TBME.2003.812203 | [X] - NAZERAN ET AL, "A User-Friendly Integrated Software Environment for Heart Rate Variability Analysis of Sleep Disordered Breathing.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 25TH ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IEEE EBMS., (20030917), XP010691299 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IEMBS.2003.1280394 | [X] - PENZET ET AL, "Systematic Comparison of Different Algorithms for Apnoea Detection Based on Electrocardiogram Recordings.", MEDICAL AND BIOLOGICAL ENGINEERING & COMPUTING., (2002), vol. 40, pages 402 - 407, XP001185110 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02345072 | [X] - ROCHE ET AL, "Predicting Sleep Apnoea Syndrome from Heart Period: A Time Frecuency Wavelet Analysis.", EUROPEAN RESPIRATORY JOURNAL., (2003), vol. 22, pages 937 - 942, XP008110795 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1183/09031936.03.00104902 | [X] - ADACHI ET AL, "Clinical Significance Of Pulse Rate Rise Sleep As A Screening Marker For The Assessment Of Sleep Fragmentation In Sleep-Disordered Breathing.", SLEEP MEDICINE., (2003), vol. 4, pages 537 - 542, XP008110798 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.sleep.2003.06.003 | by applicant | - ZYWIETZ C ET AL., "Polysomnographic sleep recording with simultaneously acquired 12 lead ecgs: a study for detection and validation of apnea related ecg changes", COMPUTERS IN CARDIOLOGY 2002. MEMPHIS, TN, SEPT 22 - 25, 2002; [COMPUTERS IN CARDIOLOGY]' NEW YORK, NY: IEEE, US, (20020922), vol. 29, doi:doi:10.1109/CIC.2002.1166837, pages 573 - 576, XP010624217 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CIC.2002.1166837 | - MAZZANTI B ET AL., "Validation of an ECG-derived respiration monitoring method", COMPUTERS IN CARDSIOLOGY 2003. THESSALONIKI, GREECE, SEPT. 21-24, 2003; [COMPUTERS IN CARDIOLOGY], NEW YORK, NY: I EEE, US, (20030921), vol. 30, doi:doi:10.1109/CIC.2003.1291230, pages 613 - 616, XP010698979 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CIC.2003.1291230 |