EP1699614 - FLEXIBLE MULTI-LAYERED MICROSTRUCTURED SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/37] | PROCESS OF MICROSTRUCTURING OF A SURFACE OF A MULTI-LAYERED FLEXIBLE SUBSTRATE, AND MICROSTRUCTURED SUBSTRATE | ||
[2008/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mactac Europe S.A. Boulevard Kennedy 7060 Soignies / BE | [2006/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOCQ, Robert, Ghislain Rue de Valenciennes 69 B-7320 Bernissart / BE | [2006/37] | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Huyssenallee 68 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Huyssenallee 100 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05700210.7 | 03.01.2005 | [2006/37] | WO2005BE00001 | Priority number, date | EP20030079017 | 29.12.2003 Original published format: EP 03079017 | [2006/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005063464 | Date: | 14.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1699614 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1699614 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B29C59/02, B29C35/08, B32B37/00, C09J7/02, B29D11/00, B32B38/06 | [2008/25] | CPC: |
B29C59/026 (EP,KR,US);
B29C59/046 (EP,KR,US);
C09J7/403 (EP,KR,US);
B29C2035/0827 (EP,KR,US);
B29L2009/00 (EP,KR,US);
C09J2423/006 (EP,KR,US);
C09J2427/006 (EP,KR,US);
C09J2467/006 (EP,KR,US);
C09J2483/005 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/14 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1452 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1457 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1486 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24612 (EP,US);
Y10T428/28 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2848 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/37] | B29C59/02, B29C35/08, B32B37/00, C09J7/02, B29D11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRLAGIGES FLEXIBLES MIKROSTRUKTURIERTES SUBSTRAT | [2008/25] | English: | FLEXIBLE MULTI-LAYERED MICROSTRUCTURED SUBSTRATE | [2008/25] | French: | SUBSTRAT SOUPLE MULTICOUCHE MICROSTRUCTURE | [2008/25] |
Former [2006/37] | VERFAHREN ZUR MIKROSTRUKTURIERUNG EINER FLÄCHE AUS EINEM MEHRLAGIGEN FLEXIBLEN SUBSTRAT UND MIKROSTRUKTURIERTES SUBSTRAT | ||
Former [2006/37] | PROCESS OF MICROSTRUCTURING OF A SURFACE OF A MULTI-LAYERED FLEXIBLE SUBSTRATE, AND MICROSTRUCTURED SUBSTRATE | ||
Former [2006/37] | PROCEDE DE MICROSTRUCTURATION D'UNE SURFACE DE SUBSTRAT SOUPLE MULTICOUCHE, ET SUBSTRAT MICROSTRUCTURE | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/37] | 06.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07007172.5 / EP1818160 | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.08.2008 | CY | 20.08.2008 | EE | 20.08.2008 | FI | 20.08.2008 | LT | 20.08.2008 | RO | 20.08.2008 | SI | 20.08.2008 | SK | 20.08.2008 | TR | 20.08.2008 | BG | 20.11.2008 | IS | 20.12.2008 | IE | 03.01.2009 | LU | 03.01.2009 | PT | 20.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | HU | 21.02.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.01.2009 | ||
LU | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
HU | 21.02.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.01.2009 | ||
LU | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
EE | 20.08.2008 | ||
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
RO | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
PT | 20.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
SK | 20.08.2008 | ||
BG | 20.11.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | AT | 20.08.2008 | |
FI | 20.08.2008 | ||
LT | 20.08.2008 | ||
SI | 20.08.2008 | ||
IS | 20.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 20.08.2008 | |
IS | 20.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0382420 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-25 * page 2, line 47 - page 3, line 51 * * page 9, line 54 - page 10, line 52 * * abstract *; | [A]US4986496 (MARENTIC FRANCIS J [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * column 1, line 12 - column 2, line 44 * * column 6, line 44 - column 7, line 29 * * figures 1-9; claims 1-17 *; | [A]EP0426441 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-25 * column 1, line 20 - column 3, line 40 * * column 6, lines 12-39 * * column 8, line 52 - column 9, line 24 * * figures 1A-4C; claims 1-13 * * abstract *; | [A]US5133516 (MARENTIC FRANCIS J [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 46 * * column 6, line 44 - column 7, line 44 * * figures 1-9; claims 1-4 * * abstract *; | [A]US5254390 (LU SHIH-LAI [US]) [A] 1-25 * column 1, line 14 - column 2, line 53 * * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 39 * * column 7, lines 34-58 * * figures 1-4; claims 1-22 * * abstract *; | [A]WO9743319 (DATACARD CORP [US]) [A] 1-25 * page 1, line 6 - page 3, line 25 * * page 9, line 26 - page 10, line 10 * * page 15, lines 7-25 * * page 24, lines 6-18 * * figures 1-7b; claims 1-78 * * abstract *; | [A]WO9818878 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US], et al) [A] 26-32 * page 7, line 14 - page 8, line 9 * * abstract *; | [A]US5814355 (SHUSTA JEANINE M [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 61 * * column 14, line 38 - column 15, line 57 * * column 17, lines 34-65 * * column 18, line 57 - column 19, line 52 * * column 21, lines 32-39 * * figures 1-16b; claims 1-32 * * abstract *; | [X]WO9955791 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 26-32 * page 1, lines 17-29 * * page 4, line 15 - page 6, line 10 * * page 8, line 4 - page 9, line 34 * * page 16, line 22 * * abstract *; | [A]US2003082326 (YANG JIE [US], et al) [A] 26-32 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] * * paragraphs [0046] - [0053] * * abstract *; | [A]US2003221770 (MEIXNER LARRY A [US], et al) [A] 26-32 * abstract *; | [A]US2004216833 (FLEMING DANNY LEROY [US], et al) [A] 26-32 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] * * paragraphs [0005] - [0022] * * paragraphs [0033] , [0038] , [0039] * * abstract *; | [L]EP1550546 (MACTAC EUROP S A [BE]) [L] 1-23,25 * < document may throw doubts on priority claims, Art. 4(C)(4) of Paris Convention, cf. also PCT/GL/ISPE/1-IV 16.69(a) >; page 2, line 3 - page 12, line 37 ** abstract * |