EP1708860 - DEVICE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF MOULDED BODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.05.2012 [2012/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOBRA Formen GmbH Plohnbachstrasse 1 08485 Lengenfeld / DE | [2006/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAUNGARDT, Rudolf Hochsteigerweg 15 82205 Gilching / DE | [2006/52] |
Former [2006/41] | 01 /
BRAUNGARDT, Rudolf Bergstrasse 33 08485 Pechtelsgrün / DE | Representative(s) | Weber, Gerhard Patentanwalt Postfach 2029 89010 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/41] | Weber, Gerhard Patentanwalt Postfach 2029 89010 Ulm / DE | Application number, filing date | 05700719.7 | 07.01.2005 | [2006/41] | WO2005EP00059 | Priority number, date | DE20041002156 | 15.01.2004 Original published format: DE102004002156 | [2006/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005068142 | Date: | 28.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1708860 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B28B1/08 | [2006/41] | CPC: |
B28B7/0014 (EP);
B28B1/081 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FORMK RPERN | [2006/41] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF MOULDED BODIES | [2006/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION DE CORPS MOULES | [2006/41] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 30.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M18) | 05.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.12.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]WO03092973 (RAMPF FORMEN GMBH; KELLER, GOTTFRIED) [DX] 1,5,7,9,13,14 * page 17, paragraph 3; figures 24,25 *; | [DY]DE2710643 (SEILER HERMANN) [DY] 1,2,9 * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 1; figures 2a-3c *; | [Y]US4395809 (WHITELEY JOHN L) [Y] 1,2,9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10157414 (HERMANN KUESEL GMBH) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0040] - [0044]; figures 4,5,8; claims 1-3 *; | [A]US3463426 (WADDINGTON PHILIP L JR) [A] 1 * the whole document * | Examination | DE10333743 | DE10233776 |