EP1745037 - Indolylmaleimide derivatives as inhibitors for the treatment of graft rejection or autoimmune diseases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/04] | INDOLYLMALEIMIDE DERIVATIVES AS PKC INHIBITORS | ||
[2012/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2010/44] |
Former [2009/43] | For:BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | |||
Former [2007/04] | For:BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
MC
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
NOVARTIS-PHARMA GMBH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Vienna / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN EIS, Maurice 26, Rue de Wentzwiller F-68220 Buschwiller / FR | 02 /
VON MATT, Peter Fichtlirain 38 CH-4105 Biel-Benken BL / CH | 03 /
WAGNER, Jürgen Nussbaumweg 24 CH-4103 Bottmingen / CH | 04 /
EVENOU, Jean-Pierre Av. du Gal-de-Gaulle 10 F-68300 St. Louis / FR | 05 /
SCHULER, Walter Kirchstr. 49 79639 Grenzach-Wyhlen / DE | [2007/04] | Representative(s) | Maucher, Wolfgang, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | Maucher, Wolfgang, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg im Breisgau / DE | ||
Former [2009/09] | Maucher, Wolfgang, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Urachstrasse 23 79102 Freiburg i. Br. / DE | ||
Former [2007/04] | Crawley, Patrick Edward Novartis AG Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 05701052.2 | 19.01.2005 | [2007/04] | WO2005EP00502 | Priority number, date | GB20040001089 | 19.01.2004 Original published format: GB 0401089 | GB20040001090 | 19.01.2004 Original published format: GB 0401090 | [2007/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005068455 | Date: | 28.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1745037 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1745037 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/04, C07D401/14, // (C07D401/14, 213:00, 209:00), C07D207:00,(C07D403/04, 209:00), C07D207:00 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2007/04] | C07D403/04, C07D401/14, // C07D401/14, C07D213/00, C07D209/00, C07D207/00, C07D403/04, C07D209/00, C07D207/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/04] | Title | German: | Zur Behandlung von Transplantatabstossung oder Autoimmunerkrankungen geeignete Indolylmaleimidderivate | [2012/37] | English: | Indolylmaleimide derivatives as inhibitors for the treatment of graft rejection or autoimmune diseases | [2012/37] | French: | Dérivés d'indolylmaléimide utiles pour le traitment de rejets de greffe ou de maladies auto-immunes | [2012/37] |
Former [2007/04] | INDOLYLMALEIMIDDERIVATE ALS PKC-INHIBITOREN | ||
Former [2007/04] | INDOLYLMALEIMIDE DERIVATIVES AS PKC INHIBITORS | ||
Former [2007/04] | DERIVES INDOLYLMALEIMIDE UTILISES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE LA PKC | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 09.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10012694.5 / EP2270001 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.01.2005 | AT | 02.01.2013 | BE | 02.01.2013 | CY | 02.01.2013 | CZ | 02.01.2013 | DK | 02.01.2013 | EE | 02.01.2013 | FI | 02.01.2013 | LT | 02.01.2013 | NL | 02.01.2013 | PL | 02.01.2013 | RO | 02.01.2013 | SE | 02.01.2013 | SI | 02.01.2013 | SK | 02.01.2013 | TR | 02.01.2013 | IE | 19.01.2013 | LU | 19.01.2013 | CH | 31.01.2013 | LI | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | BG | 02.04.2013 | GR | 03.04.2013 | IS | 02.05.2013 | PT | 02.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
TR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IE | 19.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
IE | 19.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CY | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 02.01.2013 | |
BE | 02.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 02.01.2013 | |
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 02.01.2013 | |
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 02.01.2013 | |
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | SI | 02.01.2013 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO0238561 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [DA] 5-14,17 * page 1, title * * page 1, Formula I * * page 40, paragraph 2 ** page 41, last paragraph - page 42, first paragraph * | by applicant | WO0238561 | WO03008259 | - MARTIN-BARON ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 268, no. 13, pages 9194 - 9197 |