EP1708910 - WINDSHIELD WIPER SYSTEM FOR VEHICLES, PARTICULARLY ROAD VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Wischersysteme GmbH Poststrässle 10 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2006/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINK, Andreas Pfarrstrasse 8 71723 Grossbottwar / DE | 02 /
SCHÜRLEIN, Peter Lerchenstrasse 36 74072 Heilbronn / DE | [2006/41] | Representative(s) | Jahn, Wolf-Diethart Valeo Wischersysteme GmbH Poststrässle 10 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/41] | Jahn, Wolf-Diethart Valeo Wischersysteme GmbH, Poststrässle 10 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05701138.9 | 24.01.2005 | [2006/41] | WO2005EP00647 | Priority number, date | DE20041003802 | 26.01.2004 Original published format: DE102004003802 | [2006/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005070735 | Date: | 04.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1708910 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1708910 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/34 | [2006/41] | CPC: |
B60S1/3409 (EP);
B60S1/3406 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHEIBENWISCHERANLAGE FÜR FAHRZEUGE, INSBESONDERE STRASSENFAHRZEUGE | [2006/41] | English: | WINDSHIELD WIPER SYSTEM FOR VEHICLES, PARTICULARLY ROAD VEHICLES | [2006/41] | French: | SYSTEME D'ESSUIE-GLACE POUR VEHICULES, EN PARTICULIER POUR VEHICULES ROUTIERS | [2006/41] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 22.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.11.2008 | DK | 19.11.2008 | EE | 19.11.2008 | FI | 19.11.2008 | IE | 19.11.2008 | IT | 19.11.2008 | LT | 19.11.2008 | NL | 19.11.2008 | SI | 19.11.2008 | SK | 19.11.2008 | AT | 24.01.2009 | LU | 24.01.2009 | CH | 31.01.2009 | LI | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | BG | 19.02.2009 | SE | 19.02.2009 | GR | 20.02.2009 | ES | 01.03.2009 | IS | 19.03.2009 | PT | 20.04.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | DK | 19.11.2008 | |
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.11.2008 | ||
IT | 19.11.2008 | ||
LT | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
AT | 24.01.2009 | ||
LU | 24.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
GR | 20.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
IS | 19.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | DK | 19.11.2008 | |
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.11.2008 | ||
IT | 19.11.2008 | ||
LT | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
AT | 24.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
GR | 20.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
IS | 19.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | DK | 19.11.2008 | |
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.11.2008 | ||
LT | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
AT | 24.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
GR | 20.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
IS | 19.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | DK | 19.11.2008 | |
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.11.2008 | ||
LT | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
AT | 24.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
IS | 19.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | DK | 19.11.2008 | |
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.11.2008 | ||
LT | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
IS | 19.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | FI | 19.11.2008 | |
LT | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
IS | 19.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | FI | 19.11.2008 | |
LT | 19.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
IS | 19.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 19.11.2008 | |
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 01.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0779191 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-7,14,15,17,20 * column A; figure - * * column 1, line 37 - line 63 * * column 3, line 36 - column 5, line 4 * [Y] 8,9,12,16; | [Y]US6065179 (HOSHINO TAKASHI [JP]) [Y] 8,9,12,16* figure - * | by applicant | FR1280274 | US3600739 | DE3734201 | DE19501211 | DE19807062 |