EP1763307 - PROTECTION STRUCTURE FOR THE BACK AND THE CHEST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alpinestars Research S.R.L. Via De Gasperi, 54 31010 Coste di Maser / IT | [2007/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAZZAROLO, Giovanni Via Marosticana, 33 I-31010 Coste di Maser / IT | [2007/12] | Representative(s) | Agostini, Agostino, et al Dragotti & Associati srl Via Paris Bordone 9 31100 Treviso / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | Agostini, Agostino, et al Dragotti & Associati srl Via Paris Bordone, 9 31100 Treviso / IT | Application number, filing date | 05701159.5 | 25.01.2005 | [2007/12] | WO2005EP00691 | Priority number, date | IT2004TV00076 | 06.07.2004 Original published format: IT TV20040076 | [2007/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006002696 | Date: | 12.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1763307 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1763307 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A41D13/05 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
A41D13/0518 (EP);
A41D13/0531 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUTZSTRUKTUR FÜR RÜCKEN UND BRUST | [2007/12] | English: | PROTECTION STRUCTURE FOR THE BACK AND THE CHEST | [2007/12] | French: | STRUCTURE DE PROTECTION POUR LE DOS ET LE THORAX | [2007/12] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 25.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.08.2008 | BE | 27.08.2008 | CY | 27.08.2008 | CZ | 27.08.2008 | DK | 27.08.2008 | EE | 27.08.2008 | FI | 27.08.2008 | LT | 27.08.2008 | NL | 27.08.2008 | PL | 27.08.2008 | RO | 27.08.2008 | SI | 27.08.2008 | SK | 27.08.2008 | TR | 27.08.2008 | BG | 27.11.2008 | SE | 27.11.2008 | GR | 28.11.2008 | IS | 27.12.2008 | IE | 25.01.2009 | LU | 25.01.2009 | PT | 27.01.2009 | CH | 31.01.2009 | LI | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | FR | 02.02.2009 | HU | 28.02.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
PL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
GR | 28.11.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
IE | 25.01.2009 | ||
LU | 25.01.2009 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
HU | 28.02.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
PL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
GR | 28.11.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
IE | 25.01.2009 | ||
LU | 25.01.2009 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
PL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
GR | 28.11.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
IE | 25.01.2009 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
PL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
IE | 25.01.2009 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
IE | 25.01.2009 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
FR | 02.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
SE | 27.11.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
IE | 25.01.2009 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
IE | 25.01.2009 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
EE | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
RO | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
PT | 27.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
SK | 27.08.2008 | ||
BG | 27.11.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
BE | 27.08.2008 | ||
DK | 27.08.2008 | ||
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | AT | 27.08.2008 | |
FI | 27.08.2008 | ||
LT | 27.08.2008 | ||
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
SI | 27.08.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 27.08.2008 | |
NL | 27.08.2008 | ||
IS | 27.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB577157 (HARRY BECKHAM RANDOLPH) [X] 1,3,5,9,10 * page 1, line 24 - line 25 * * page 1, line 29 - line 32 * * page 1, line 38 - line 39 * * page 1, line 78 - line 80 * * page 1, line 87 * * page 1, line 92 - line 93 * * page 1, line 99 * * page 2, line 7 - line 8 * [Y] 8; | [A]WO9809545 (POWERSPORTS SAFETY CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,3,5,6 * page 2, line 7 ** page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 2 *; | [XY]US6026509 (BACHNER JR THOMAS E [US]) [X] 1,3,9 * column 3, line 39 - line 41 * * column 3, line 43 * * column 3, line 55 - line 57 * * column 3, line 60 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 1 * [Y] 2,8; | [Y]US2002069444 (GRAHAM TED [US], et al) [Y] 2 * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] * |