EP1711494 - ARYL SUBSTITUTED HETEROCYCLES, METHOD FOR PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF AS MEDICAMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2010/23] |
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWINK, Lothar Am Hintertor 2 35260 Stadtallendorf / DE | 02 /
STENGELIN, Siegfried Sachsenring 27 65817 Eppstein / DE | 03 /
BOEHME, Thomas Höngenstrasse 49 65428 Rüsselsheim / DE | 04 /
GOSSEL, Matthias Im Lorsbachtal 17a 65428 Hofheim / DE | 05 /
HESSLER, Gerhard Im Langewann 53 65719 Hofheim / DE | 06 /
LENNIG, Petra c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2006/52] |
Former [2006/42] | 01 /
SCHWINK, Lothar Am Hintertor 2 35260 Stadtallendorf / DE | ||
02 /
STENGELIN, Siegfried Sachsenring 27 65817 Eppstein / DE | |||
03 /
BOEHME, Thomas Höngenstrasse 49 65428 Rüsselsheim / DE | |||
04 /
GOSSEL, Matthias Im Lorsbachtal 17a 65428 Hofheim / DE | |||
05 /
HESSLER, Gerhard Im Langewann 53 65719 Hofheim / DE | |||
06 /
STAHL, Petra Pestalozzistrasse 16 60385 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 05701163.7 | 25.01.2005 | [2006/42] | WO2005EP00699 | Priority number, date | DE20041003812 | 25.01.2004 Original published format: DE102004003812 | [2006/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005070925 | Date: | 04.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1711494 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1711494 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/10, C07D413/14, C07D417/14, C07D417/10, C07D491/113, A61K31/4245, A61P3/04, A61P3/10 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
C07D491/10 (EP);
C07D413/10 (EP,KR);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D413/14 (EP,KR);
C07D417/10 (EP);
C07D417/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARYLSUBSTITUIERTE HETEROZYKLEN, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS ARZNEIMITTEL | [2006/42] | English: | ARYL SUBSTITUTED HETEROCYCLES, METHOD FOR PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF AS MEDICAMENTS | [2006/42] | French: | HETEROCYCLES ARYL-SUBSTITUES, PROCEDE POUR LEUR PRODUCTION ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME MEDICAMENTS | [2006/42] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 25.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.06.2010 | CZ | 09.06.2010 | EE | 09.06.2010 | HU | 09.06.2010 | LT | 09.06.2010 | PL | 09.06.2010 | RO | 09.06.2010 | SI | 09.06.2010 | SK | 09.06.2010 | TR | 09.06.2010 | BG | 09.09.2010 | IS | 09.10.2010 | AT | 25.01.2011 | FI | 25.01.2011 | IE | 25.01.2011 | IT | 25.01.2011 | LU | 25.01.2011 | ES | 26.01.2011 | SE | 26.01.2011 | BE | 31.01.2011 | CH | 31.01.2011 | DK | 31.01.2011 | LI | 31.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
TR | 09.06.2010 | ||
BG | 09.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
AT | 25.01.2011 | ||
FI | 25.01.2011 | ||
IE | 25.01.2011 | ||
IT | 25.01.2011 | ||
LU | 25.01.2011 | ||
ES | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
DK | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
BG | 09.09.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
AT | 25.01.2011 | ||
FI | 25.01.2011 | ||
IE | 25.01.2011 | ||
IT | 25.01.2011 | ||
LU | 25.01.2011 | ||
ES | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
DK | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
AT | 25.01.2011 | ||
FI | 25.01.2011 | ||
IE | 25.01.2011 | ||
IT | 25.01.2011 | ||
LU | 25.01.2011 | ||
ES | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
DK | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
AT | 25.01.2011 | ||
FI | 25.01.2011 | ||
IE | 25.01.2011 | ||
IT | 25.01.2011 | ||
ES | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
DK | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
AT | 25.01.2011 | ||
FI | 25.01.2011 | ||
IE | 25.01.2011 | ||
IT | 25.01.2011 | ||
ES | 26.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
DK | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
FI | 25.01.2011 | ||
IE | 25.01.2011 | ||
IT | 25.01.2011 | ||
ES | 26.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
DK | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
FI | 25.01.2011 | ||
IE | 25.01.2011 | ||
IT | 25.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
DK | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
FI | 25.01.2011 | ||
IE | 25.01.2011 | ||
IT | 25.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
FI | 25.01.2011 | ||
IT | 25.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
FI | 25.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
FI | 25.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2011 | ||
LI | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
IS | 09.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
CZ | 09.06.2010 | ||
EE | 09.06.2010 | ||
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
RO | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
SK | 09.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | CY | 09.06.2010 | |
LT | 09.06.2010 | ||
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | LT | 09.06.2010 | |
PL | 09.06.2010 | ||
SI | 09.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | LT | 09.06.2010 | |
SI | 09.06.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9726258 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [X] 1-8,10,11,14,17 * page 11, line 34; claims 1,8,9 * * table 2; compounds 17,67,70 * * table 7; compound 167 *; | [X]WO0066578 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * examples 2,10,49,50,52,63,64,89,109,110 * * claims 42,50 * * pages 69-73 *; | [X]WO0078758 (WELFIDE CORP [JP]) [X] 1-8,10,11,14 * claim 1 * * page 36 - page 37; examples 31,32 * * page 64 - page 65; examples 85-88 * * page 72 - page 73; examples 104,105 * * page 102 - page 103; examples 29-31 *; | [X]WO0182930 (TULARIK INC [US], et al) [X] 1,8,10,11,14 * claim 1 * * examples 19,23-25 *; | [X]WO02079200 (PFIZER LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-8,10,11,14 * page 58; compounds 37,38 * * page 84; compound 78 * * page 133 - page 135; compounds 80-83 * * claim 1 *; | [AD]WO03087044 (7TM PHARMA AS [DK], et al) [AD] 1-17 * claims 1,12 *; | [X]WO03089418 (BAYER PHARMACEUTICALS CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * claims 1,11,14 * * page 82; example 177 * * page 97 - page 99 *; | [DA]WO03097047 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [DA] 1-17 * claim - *; | [PA]WO2004072025 (AVENTIS PHARMA GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1-17* claim - *; | [PX]WO2004111045 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1 * pages 23-28; compounds 3,4,11,12,15,16 * |