EP1701785 - MODIFIED MOLECULAR ARRAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illumina Cambridge Limited Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | For all designated states Illumina Cambridge Limited Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB | ||
Former [2006/38] | For all designated states Solexa Ltd. Chesterford Research Park, Little Chesterford Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Mark Edward Brennan Solexa Limited Chesterford Research Limited Little Chesterford Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB | 02 /
SABOT, Andrea Solexa Limited Chesterford Research Limited Little Chesterford Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB | 03 /
RASALONJATOVO, Isabelle Marie Julia Solexa Limited Chesterford Research Limited Little Chesterford Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB | 04 /
SOHNA SOHNA, Jean-Ernest Solexa Limited Chesterford Research Limited Little Chesterford Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB | 05 /
HORGAN, Adrian Martin Solexa Limited Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB | 06 /
SWERDLOW, Harold Philip Solexa Limited Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB | [2006/38] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2006/38] | Baldock, Sharon Claire BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 05701804.6 | 07.01.2005 | [2006/38] | WO2005GB00033 | Priority number, date | GB20040000253 | 07.01.2004 Original published format: GB 0400253 | EP20040254726 | 05.08.2004 Original published format: EP 04254726 | [2006/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005065814 | Date: | 21.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1701785 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/00, C12Q1/68 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
B01J19/0046 (EP,US);
C08F222/38 (US);
C12Q1/6806 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6834 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6837 (US);
C12Q1/6876 (US);
C40B40/06 (EP,US);
C40B50/18 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00351 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00527 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00529 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00585 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00596 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00605 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00608 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0061 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00612 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00617 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00626 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00637 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00639 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00641 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00716 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0072 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTE MOLEKÜLARRAYS | [2006/38] | English: | MODIFIED MOLECULAR ARRAYS | [2006/38] | French: | RESEAUX MOLECULAIRES MODIFIES | [2006/38] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 09.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/04] | 19.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/04] | Divisional application(s) | EP14164003.7 / EP2789383 | EP17150990.4 / EP3175914 | EP20151474.2 / EP3673986 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5858653 (DURAN LISE W [US], et al) [X] 1,17 * column 2, line 45 - line 60; examples 9,10 *; | [X]US5948621 (TURNER DAVID C [US], et al) [X] 37-56 * column 8, line 7 - line 22 *; | [X]WO9961653 (SYNTRIX BIOCHIP [US], et al) [X] 1,51,54 * page 36, line 23 - line 24; figures 1,2 *; | [DX]WO0031148 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al) [DX] 1-18,57-60 * page 6, line 2 - line 11; examples 2,3 * * page 7, line 7 - line 20 *; | [X]US6077674 (SCHLEIFER ARTHUR [US], et al) [X] 1,51,54 * column 12, line 34 - line 41; claim 1 *; | [DX]WO0101143 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al) [DX] 1-36,51-60 * page 1 - page 2, line 27; examples 3,8; claims 1-34 *; | [X]WO0123082 (NANOGEN INC [US]) [X] 1-36,51-60 * page 13 - page 17; figure 18; examples 2,3,5; claims 1-66 *; | [X]WO02059372 (BIOCEPT INC [US], et al) [X] 37-56 * page 21, line 14 - line 30; claims 25-37 *; | [PX]WO2004073843 (UNIV MCMASTER [CA], et al) [PX] 1,17 * claim 21 *; | [DA] - KARTALOV ET AL., "Polyelectrolyte Surface Interface for Single-Molecule Fluorescence Studies of DNA Polymerase", BIOTECHNIQUES, (2003), vol. 34, no. 3, pages 505 - 510, XP002310467 [DA] 37-56 * the whole document * | Examination | US5212253 |