EP1716612 - A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR OPERATING A SOLID-OXIDE FUEL CELL STACK WITH A MIXED IONIC/ELECTRONIC CONDUCTING ELECTROLYTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ceres Intellectual Property Company Limited Viking House, Foundry Lane Horsham Sussex RH13 5PX / GB | [2010/28] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Ceres Intellectual Property Company Limited Unit 18, Denvale Trade Park Haslett Avenue East Crawley West Sussex RH10 1SS / GB | ||
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states Ceres Power Limited Unit 18, Denvale Trade Park, Haslett Avenue East Crawley West Sussex RH10 1SS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEAH, Robert 24 Chiswick Close Croydon, Surrey CR0 4SY / GB | 02 /
BRANDON, Nigel, Peter 60 York Road Sutton, Surrey SM2 6HJ / GB | 03 /
DUCKETT, Athol 2 Providence Place Epsom, Surrey KT17 4BB / GB | 04 /
EL-KOURY, Karim Flat 2, 64 Salcott Road London SW11 6DE / GB | 05 /
SCHMIDT, Martin 31 Lodge Road Wallington SM6 0TZ / GB | [2007/03] |
Former [2006/44] | 01 /
LEAH, Robert Flat 2, 10 Ledbury Place Croydon, Surrey CR0 1ET / GB | ||
02 /
BRANDON, Nigel, Peter 60 York Road Sutton, Surrey SM2 6HJ / GB | |||
03 /
DUCKETT, Athol 2 Providence Place Epsom, Surrey KT17 4BB / GB | |||
04 /
EL-KOURY, Karim 4 Egerton House, 59 Belgrave Road London SW1V 2BE / GB | |||
05 /
SCHMIDT, Martin 31 Lodge Road Wallington SM6 0TZ / GB | Representative(s) | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2010/18] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | Johnson, Terence Leslie Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London, WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/44] | Johnson, Terence Leslie Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre GB-London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05702095.0 | 02.02.2005 | [2006/44] | WO2005GB00355 | Priority number, date | GB20040002906 | 10.02.2004 Original published format: GB 0402906 | [2006/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005078843 | Date: | 25.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1716612 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1716612 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, H01M8/12 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
H01M8/04014 (EP,US);
H01M8/04 (KR);
H01M8/12 (GB,KR);
H01M8/04925 (US);
H01M8/04097 (EP,US);
H01M8/04365 (EP,US);
H01M8/04395 (EP,US);
H01M8/04417 (EP,US);
H01M8/04559 (EP,US);
H01M8/04619 (EP,US);
H01M8/04731 (EP,US);
H01M8/126 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/44] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETREIBEN EINES FESTOXID-BRENNSTOFFZELLENSTAPELS MIT EINEM GEMISCHT IONISCHEN/ELEKTRONISCHEN LEITENDEN ELEKTROLYT | [2006/44] | English: | A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR OPERATING A SOLID-OXIDE FUEL CELL STACK WITH A MIXED IONIC/ELECTRONIC CONDUCTING ELECTROLYTE | [2006/44] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN ASSEMBLAGE DE PILES A COMBUSTIBLE A OXYDE SOLIDE AVEC UN ELECTROLYTE A CONDUCTION MIXTE IONIQUE/ELECTRONIQUE | [2006/44] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 19.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.06.2012 | EE | 06.06.2012 | FI | 06.06.2012 | LT | 06.06.2012 | RO | 06.06.2012 | SI | 06.06.2012 | SK | 06.06.2012 | BG | 06.09.2012 | GR | 07.09.2012 | IS | 06.10.2012 | MC | 28.02.2013 | [2013/42] |
Former [2013/34] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
BG | 06.09.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
RO | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
SK | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
IS | 06.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
EE | 06.06.2012 | ||
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
SI | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
GR | 07.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 06.06.2012 | |
FI | 06.06.2012 | ||
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 06.06.2012 | |
LT | 06.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 06.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS6079675 ; | [X]JPS58112262 ; | [X]US2001036566 (DEKKER NICOLAAS JACOBUS JOSEPH [NL], et al); | [E]GB2405028 (CERES POWER LTD [GB]); |