EP1706238 - Method of making a plurality of tool inserts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/40] | TOOL INSERT | ||
[2013/44] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Element Six Limited Shannon Airport County Clare / IE | [2006/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLYNN, John David Knockaderra, Ballycoree Road Ennis, County Clare / IE | 02 /
LINNANE, Stephen James 10 Tullyvarraga Hill Shannon, County Clare / IE | [2006/40] | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Price, Nigel John King, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/10] | Price, Nigel John King, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/40] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 05702175.0 | 05.01.2005 | [2006/40] | WO2005IB00004 | Priority number, date | IE20040000003 | 06.01.2004 Original published format: IE 20040003 | [2006/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005068129 | Date: | 28.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1706238 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B23P15/28, B23B27/14, B23C5/20 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
B23P15/28 (EP,KR,US);
B23B27/14 (EP,KR,US);
B23C5/20 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von mehreren Werkzeugeinsätzen | [2013/44] | English: | Method of making a plurality of tool inserts | [2013/44] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'une pluralité de plaquettes d'outil | [2013/44] |
Former [2006/40] | WERKZEUGEINSATZ | ||
Former [2006/40] | TOOL INSERT | ||
Former [2006/40] | PLAQUETTE D'OUTIL | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/40] | 20.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/34] | 07.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2007 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.02.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 21.02.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.03.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]JPH03287396 ; | [A]JPS5816003 ; | [A]US1734554 (BEHRMAN MARCUS B) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP0019461 (DE BEERS IND DIAMOND [ZA]) [A] 1-12* column 4, line 28 - column 5, line 7; figure 4 *; | [A]DE3300105 (BARKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US4849602 (GARDNER EDWARD R [US]) [Y] 1,5-12 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 51; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5676496 (LITTECKE PETER [SE], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 3, line 23 - column 5, line 22; figures 12-15 *; | [Y]US6120570 (PACKER SCOTT M [US], et al) [Y] 1,5-12 * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 3 *; | [A]WO03070416 (ELEMENT SIX PTY LTD [ZA], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 4, line 3 - page 6, line 16; figures 1a-8c *; | [XI]US6663326 (HIROYASU MINORU [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,5-8,10,12 * column 9, line 45 - column 11, line 60; figures 1-12 * [I] 2,4,9,11 | [XI] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920327), vol. 016, no. 122, Database accession no. (M - 1226), & JP03287396 A 19911218 (KAWAGUCHIKO SEIMITSU KK) [X] 1,5-9,11,12 * abstract * [I] 2 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830416), vol. 007, no. 092, Database accession no. (M - 208), & JP58016003 A 19830129 (NIPPON TOKUSHU TOGYO KK) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | Examination | US4121081 |