EP1703785 - AN APPARATUS AND A PROCESS FOR GATHERING AGRICULTURAL PRODUCE FROM A FIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saetti, Luciano Via Santa Maria, 397 41019 Soliera / IT | [2006/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/39] | Representative(s) | Gotra, Stefano BUGNION S.p.A. Via M. Vellani, 20 41124 Modena / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | Gotra, Stefano BUGNION S.p.A. Via Emilia Est 25 41100 Modena / IT | Application number, filing date | 05702202.2 | 11.01.2005 | [2006/39] | WO2005IB00031 | Priority number, date | IT2004MO00010 | 16.01.2004 Original published format: IT MO20040010 | [2006/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005077145 | Date: | 25.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1703785 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1703785 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A01D46/00 | [2006/39] | CPC: |
A01D46/00 (EP);
A01D2046/262 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFSAMMELN VON LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHEN ERZEUGNISSEN VON EINEM FELD | [2006/39] | English: | AN APPARATUS AND A PROCESS FOR GATHERING AGRICULTURAL PRODUCE FROM A FIELD | [2006/39] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE RECOLTE D'UN PRODUIT DE L'AGRICULTURE A PARTIR D'UN CHAMP | [2006/39] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/39] | 09.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.09.2008 | BE | 10.09.2008 | CY | 10.09.2008 | CZ | 10.09.2008 | DK | 10.09.2008 | EE | 10.09.2008 | FI | 10.09.2008 | LT | 10.09.2008 | NL | 10.09.2008 | PL | 10.09.2008 | RO | 10.09.2008 | SI | 10.09.2008 | SK | 10.09.2008 | TR | 10.09.2008 | BG | 10.12.2008 | SE | 10.12.2008 | GR | 11.12.2008 | IS | 10.01.2009 | GB | 11.01.2009 | IE | 11.01.2009 | LU | 11.01.2009 | CH | 31.01.2009 | LI | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | PT | 10.02.2009 | HU | 11.03.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
PL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
GR | 11.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
GB | 11.01.2009 | ||
IE | 11.01.2009 | ||
LU | 11.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
HU | 11.03.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
PL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
GR | 11.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
GB | 11.01.2009 | ||
IE | 11.01.2009 | ||
LU | 11.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
PL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
GR | 11.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
GB | 11.01.2009 | ||
IE | 11.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
PL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
GB | 11.01.2009 | ||
IE | 11.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
GB | 11.01.2009 | ||
IE | 11.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
GB | 11.01.2009 | ||
IE | 11.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
GB | 11.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
BE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | AT | 10.09.2008 | |
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 10.09.2008 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3955343 (TICO RAMON) [X] 1-5,7,10,11 * the whole document * [Y] 9; | [XY]US4759680 (SIMPSON III LELAND S [US]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 8 - line 19 * * column 4, line 13 - column 6, line 9 * * column 8, line 29 - column 10, line 21; figures 1-4 * [Y] 9; | [XA]US5042240 (ROCCA EARL R [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *[A] 11 |