30.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
23.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] |
08.07.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |
29.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2011 [2011/22] |
26.11.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] |
15.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] |
23.10.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] |
29.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] |
24.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] |
20.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] |
13.03.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] |
13.03.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] |
27.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] |
20.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] |
23.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] |
23.01.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] |
09.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] |
26.12.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.01.2009 [2009/05] |
14.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] |
13.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] |
12.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] |
24.10.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2008 [2008/48] |
26.09.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] |
04.04.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] |
28.03.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
28.03.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.02.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.11.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.08.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.06.2007 |
Change - applicant |
published on 01.08.2007 [2007/31] |
30.03.2007 |
First examination report |
|
29.03.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.03.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] |
14.02.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.01.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.12.2006 |
Change - representative |
published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] |
10.11.2006 |
First examination report |
|
08.11.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.11.2006 |
Change - representative |
published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] |
01.09.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] |
01.09.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] |
24.08.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.06.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.05.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.08.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.07.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.03.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|