EP1706190 - SEPARATION OF CRUDE OIL AT THE WELL HEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schlumberger Norge AS Post Box 8013 4068 Stavanger / NO | [2011/29] |
Former [2007/10] | For all designated states M-I EPCON AS P.O. Box 2595 3908 Porsgrunn / NO | ||
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states Epcon Norge AS Thor yaveien 21 3209 Sandefjord / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSEROD, Stein, Egil Casa la Palma, Lipayo, Dauin 6217 Negros Oriental / PH | [2006/40] | Representative(s) | Arrowsmith, Peter Michael E. Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [2013/23] |
Former [2011/23] | Trier, Mikkel Roed, et al Awapatent A/S Rigensgade 11 1316 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [2006/40] | Rotne, Jens Styrup, et al Internationalt Patent-Bureau A/S Rigensgade 11 1316 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 05702303.8 | 20.01.2005 | [2006/40] | WO2005IB00142 | Priority number, date | DK20040000068 | 20.01.2004 Original published format: DK 200400068 | [2006/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005079946 | Date: | 01.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1706190 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B01D19/00, E21B43/34 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
E21B43/35 (EP,US);
B01D17/00 (EP,US);
B01D17/0205 (EP,US);
B01D17/0217 (EP,US);
B01D19/0057 (EP,US);
B01D21/10 (EP,US);
B01D21/2411 (EP,US);
B01D21/2427 (EP,US);
B01D21/2494 (EP,US);
B03D1/1412 (EP,US);
B03D1/1418 (EP,US);
B03D1/247 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABTRENNUNG VON ROHÖL AM BOHRLOCHKOPF | [2006/40] | English: | SEPARATION OF CRUDE OIL AT THE WELL HEAD | [2006/40] | French: | SEPARATION DE PETROLE BRUT AU NIVEAU DE LA TETE DE PUITS | [2006/40] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/40] | 29.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/01] | 27.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3812655 (BENNETT D) [A] 1-9,1-9,1-9 * the whole document * * the whole document ** the whole document *; | [Y]US5570744 (WEINGARTEN JEAN S [US], et al) [Y] 4,4,4 * figure 2 * * figure 2 * * figure 2 *; | [XY]EP1208897 (EPCON NORGE AS [NO]) [X] 1-3,5-9,1-3,5-9,1-3,5-9 * abstract * * abstract * * abstract * [Y] 4,4,4; | [XD]WO0241965 (EPCON NORGE AS [NO], et al) [XD] 1-3,5-9,1-3,5-9,1-3,5-9 | by applicant | US4424068 | WO9920873 | WO0241965 |