EP1712047 - AD-HOC CONNECTION BETWEEN ELECTRONIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POHJA, Seppo Insinöörinkatu 51 A 16 FIN-33720 Tampere / FI | 02 /
HIETASARKA, Juha Myllypurontie 10 FIN-36120 Suinula / FI | 03 /
HUSSMANN, Holger Vihilahdenkatu 17 A 15 FIN-33900 Tampere / FI | [2006/42] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2016/42] |
Former [2008/31] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2006/42] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 05702396.2 | 31.01.2005 | [2006/42] | WO2005IB00247 | Priority number, date | US20040773765 | 05.02.2004 Original published format: US 773765 | [2006/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005076542 | Date: | 18.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1712047 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1712047 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, H04W4/20, H04W76/02 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
H04M1/72412 (EP,US);
H04W84/18 (EP,KR,US);
H04L41/22 (US);
G06F3/048 (US);
H04W4/21 (EP,US);
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/42] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/42] |
Former [2006/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AD-HOC-VERBINDUNG ZWISCHEN ELEKTRONISCHEN EINRICHTUNGEN | [2006/42] | English: | AD-HOC CONNECTION BETWEEN ELECTRONIC DEVICES | [2006/42] | French: | CONNEXION AD HOC ENTRE DES DISPOSITIFS ELECTRONIQUES | [2006/42] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 21.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.09.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 14.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.01.2005 | AT | 19.10.2016 | BE | 19.10.2016 | CY | 19.10.2016 | CZ | 19.10.2016 | DK | 19.10.2016 | EE | 19.10.2016 | ES | 19.10.2016 | FI | 19.10.2016 | IT | 19.10.2016 | LT | 19.10.2016 | MC | 19.10.2016 | NL | 19.10.2016 | PL | 19.10.2016 | RO | 19.10.2016 | SE | 19.10.2016 | SI | 19.10.2016 | SK | 19.10.2016 | TR | 19.10.2016 | BG | 19.01.2017 | GR | 20.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | FR | 31.01.2017 | IE | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | LU | 31.01.2017 | IS | 19.02.2017 | PT | 20.02.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 31.01.2005 | |
AT | 19.10.2016 | ||
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CY | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
IE | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 31.01.2005 | |
AT | 19.10.2016 | ||
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
IE | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
IE | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SI | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
MC | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
BG | 19.01.2017 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
IT | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
SK | 19.10.2016 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
EE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
RO | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
DK | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 19.10.2016 | |
BE | 19.10.2016 | ||
ES | 19.10.2016 | ||
FI | 19.10.2016 | ||
LT | 19.10.2016 | ||
NL | 19.10.2016 | ||
PL | 19.10.2016 | ||
SE | 19.10.2016 | ||
GR | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 19.02.2017 | ||
PT | 20.02.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1255383 (NOKIA CORPORATION) [A] 1-61,1-61,1-61 * paragraphs [0037] - [0040] - [0049] , [0050] * * paragraphs [0037] - [0040] - [0049] , [0050] ** paragraphs [0037] - [0040] - [0049] , [0050] *; | WO03015451 [ ] (SONY CORP [JP], et al); | WO03034660 [ ] (SONY CORP [JP], et al); | [X]EP1330075 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-61,1-61,1-61 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraphs [0169] , [0170] , [0211] , [0212] * * paragraph [0230] - paragraph [0238] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraphs [0169] , [0170] , [0211] , [0212] * * paragraph [0230] - paragraph [0238] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraphs [0169] , [0170] , [0211] , [0212] * * paragraph [0230] - paragraph [0238] *; | [X]US2003162556 (LIBES MICHAEL A [US]) [X] 1-61,1-61,1-61 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0045] *; | [XP]EP1414264 (SONY CORP [JP]) [XP] 1-61,1-61,1-61 * paragraphs [0086] , [0087] , [0095] , [0103] - [0118] - [0143] - [0152] - [0184] * * paragraphs [0086] , [0087] , [0095] , [0103] - [0118] - [0143] - [0152] - [0184] * * paragraphs [0086] , [0087] , [0095] , [0103] - [0118] - [0143] - [0152] - [0184] *; | [XP]EP1437863 (SONY CORP [JP]) [XP] 1-61,1-61,1-61 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraphs [0094] , [0113] - [0124] - [0144] - [0147] - [0149] - [0157] - [0168] , [0184] , [0212] - [0216] - [0238] * * paragraph [0253] - paragraph [0262] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraphs [0094] , [0113] - [0124] - [0144] - [0147] - [0149] - [0157] - [0168] , [0184] , [0212] - [0216] - [0238] * * paragraph [0253] - paragraph [0262] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraphs [0094] , [0113] - [0124] - [0144] - [0147] - [0149] - [0157] - [0168] , [0184] , [0212] - [0216] - [0238] * * paragraph [0253] - paragraph [0262] * | by applicant | EP1330075 | US2003162556 | EP1414264 | EP1437863 |