EP1708862 - PLASTIC MATERIAL METERING SYSTEM FOR PLASTIC ARTICLES MANUFACTURING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aisapack Holding SA Rue de la Praise 1896 Vouvry / CH | [2006/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANOT, Dominique, @Aisapack Holding S.A. rue de la Praise CH-1896 Vouvry / CH | [2014/11] |
Former [2006/41] | 01 /
HANOT, Dominique, Aisapack Holding S.A. rue de la Praise CH-1896 Vouvry / CH | Representative(s) | Grosfillier, Philippe ANDRE ROLAND SA IP Attorneys & Services Avenue Collonges 21 1004 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | Grosfillier, Philippe ANDRE ROLAND SA Chemin des Charmettes 9 P.O. Box 5107 1002 Lausanne / CH | ||
Former [2006/41] | Grosfillier, Philippe Andre Roland S.A. Intellectual Property Services Avenue Tissot 15 P.O. Box 1255 1001 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 05702672.6 | 14.01.2005 | [2006/41] | WO2005IB50162 | Priority number, date | CH20040000129 | 29.01.2004 Original published format: CH 1292004 | [2006/50] |
Former [2006/41] | CH20040012904 | 29.01.2004 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005072051 | Date: | 11.08.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1708862 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1708862 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B29C31/04, B29C31/06, B29C47/20 | [2006/41] | CPC: |
B29C31/063 (EP,US);
B29C31/048 (EP,US);
B29C48/475 (EP,US);
B29C48/09 (EP,US);
B29C49/041 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/41] | Title | German: | KUNSTSTOFFMATERIALDOSIERSYSTEM FÜR KUNSTSTOFFARTIKELHERSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2006/41] | English: | PLASTIC MATERIAL METERING SYSTEM FOR PLASTIC ARTICLES MANUFACTURING DEVICE | [2006/41] | French: | SYSTEME DE DOSAGE DE MATIERE PLASTIQUE POUR DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D' ARTICLES EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE | [2006/41] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 11.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.01.2005 | CY | 12.03.2014 | CZ | 12.03.2014 | DK | 12.03.2014 | EE | 12.03.2014 | FI | 12.03.2014 | LT | 12.03.2014 | MC | 12.03.2014 | NL | 12.03.2014 | PL | 12.03.2014 | RO | 12.03.2014 | SI | 12.03.2014 | TR | 12.03.2014 | GR | 13.06.2014 | IS | 12.07.2014 | PT | 14.07.2014 | [2017/40] |
Former [2016/28] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/43] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 12.03.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH0740400 ; | [AX]JPH07266379 ; | [A]US3386132 (EDWARD FISCHER) [A] 1,10,12 * abstract * * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 3 * * column 3, line 18 - line 51 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB1199445 (NETSTAL AG MASCHF GIESSEREI [CH]) [X] 11 * page 1, line 87 - page 2, line 65 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR1601290 (PAUL PAYS) [A] 1,10,12 * page 2, line 11 - line 21 * * page 3, line 11 - line 32 * * figure a *; | [A]FR2299957 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND [JP]) [A] 7 * page 5, line 14 - page 7, line 18 ** figures 2,3 *; | [A]US4444702 (THOMAS ALFRED [DE], et al) [A] 1,10,12 * column 6, line 47 - column 7, line 15 * * column 8, line 66 - column 9, line 11 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US4959001 (LANGLOIS JACQUES A E [DE], et al) [A] 1,10,12 * column 1, line 6 - line 21 * * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 28 * * figure . *; | [Y]US5256051 (LANGOS PETER [DE], et al) [Y] 7 * column 1, line 6 - line 22 * * column 4, line 24 - line 62 * * figures 1-3 *; | [YX]US5281384 (BANKS WILLIAM C [US]) [Y] 8,9 * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 24 * * figures 4a,4b * [X] 11; | [AY]US5645873 (CARTER JR JERRY A [US]) [A] 1,10,12 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 14 * * column 5, line 8 - column 6, line 40 * * figures 2,3 * [Y] 2,4-6; | [PX]WO2004026556 (MOLD MASTERS LTD [CA], et al) [PX] 1,10 * page 6, line 16 - page 7, line 29 * * page 8, line 26 - page 9, line 17 * * figures 1,5-10 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950630), vol. 1995, no. 05, & JP07040400 A 19950210 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [X] 1,10,12 * abstract * [Y] 2,4-9 | [AX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP07266379 A 19951017 (MEIKI CO LTD) [A] 1,10 * abstract * [X] 12 |