Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7451693 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2008 | B2 | US2007261572 | 15.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005IT00016 | 14.01.2005 | ITMI20041969 | 15.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5053851B | Global Dossier | 24.10.2012 | B2 | JP2008516773 | 22.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005IT00016 | 14.01.2005 | ITMI20041969 | 15.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005293161B | Global Dossier | 07.10.2010 | B2 | AU2005293161 | 20.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005IT00016 | 14.01.2005 | ITMI20041969 | 15.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1809470 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2016 | B1 | EP1809470 | 25.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005IT00016 | 14.01.2005 | ITMI20041969 | 15.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0516487 | 09.09.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005IT00016 | 14.01.2005 | ITMI20041969 | 15.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2583213 | 20.11.2012 | C | CA2583213 | 20.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005IT00016 | 14.01.2005 | ITMI20041969 | 15.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101048274B | 21.07.2010 | B | CN101048274 | 03.10.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005IT00016 | 14.01.2005 | ITMI20041969 | 15.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA011141 | 27.02.2009 | B1 | EA200700853 | 26.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005IT00016 | 14.01.2005 | ITMI20041969 | 15.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2579176T | 05.08.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2005IT00016 | 14.01.2005 | ITMI20041969 | 15.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ554932 | 26.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005IT00016 | 14.01.2005 | ITMI20041969 | 15.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1809470T | 31.08.2016 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005IT00016 | 14.01.2005 | EP05703265 | 14.01.2005 | ITMI20041969 | 15.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA90870 | 10.06.2010 | C2 | Priority number | Date | WO2005IT00016 | 14.01.2005 | ITMI20041969 | 15.10.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006040783 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20041969 | 15.10.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE029565T | 28.03.2017 | T2 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20041969 | 15.10.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ITMI20041969 | 15.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20041969 | 15.10.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1809470T | 30.09.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20041969 | 15.10.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200703862 | 25.06.2008 | B | Priority number | Date | ITMI20041969 | 15.10.2004 |