EP1809470 - COMPACTING MACHINE WITH REDUCED FRICTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CAEB International S.r.l. Largo Donegani Guido 2 20121 Milano (MI) / IT | [2016/14] |
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states CAEB International S.r.l. Via Turati 29 20121 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROTA, Guido Via Paolo Gasparotto, 86/B 24010 Petosino-Sorisole / IT | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | Simino, Massimo, et al Cuccia & Simino S.r.l. Corso di Porta Romana, 23 20122 Milano / IT | [2016/15] |
Former [2010/36] | Simino, Massimo, et al Cuccia & Simino S.r.l. Corso di Porta Romana, 23 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2009/48] | Perani, Aurelio, et al Perani Mezzanotte & Partners Piazza San Babila, 5 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2009/38] | Simino, Massimo, et al Perani Mezzanotte & Partners Piazza S. Babila 5 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2007/30] | Simino, Massimo, et al Perani Mezzanotte & Partners Piazza San Babila 5 I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 05703265.8 | 14.01.2005 | [2007/30] | WO2005IT00016 | Priority number, date | IT2004MI01969 | 15.10.2004 Original published format: IT MI20041969 | [2007/30] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006040783 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1809470 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1809470 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A01F15/18, B30B9/30, A01F15/08, A01F15/07 | [2015/47] | CPC: |
A01F15/0883 (EP,US);
A01F15/07 (EP,US);
A01F15/085 (EP,US);
A01F2015/0775 (EP,US);
A01F2015/186 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/30] | B30B9/30, A01F15/08, A01F15/07 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/15] |
Former [2007/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 30.04.2007 | BA | 30.04.2007 | HR | 30.04.2007 | LV | 30.04.2007 | MK | 30.04.2007 | YU | 30.04.2007 | Title | German: | VERDICHTUNGSMASCHINE MIT VERRINGERTER REIBUNG | [2007/30] | English: | COMPACTING MACHINE WITH REDUCED FRICTION | [2007/30] | French: | MACHINE DE COMPACTAGE À FROTTEMENT RÉDUIT | [2015/48] |
Former [2007/30] | MACHINE DE COMPACTAGE A FROTTEMENT REDUIT | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2006 | Translation filed | 30.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 27.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 24.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 13.04.2016 | CY | 13.04.2016 | CZ | 13.04.2016 | DK | 13.04.2016 | EE | 13.04.2016 | FI | 13.04.2016 | LT | 13.04.2016 | MC | 13.04.2016 | NL | 13.04.2016 | PT | 13.04.2016 | SE | 13.04.2016 | SK | 13.04.2016 | GR | 14.07.2016 | IS | 13.08.2016 | GB | 14.01.2017 | IE | 14.01.2017 | LU | 14.01.2017 | SI | 15.01.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | BE | 13.04.2016 | |
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PT | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
GB | 14.01.2017 | ||
IE | 14.01.2017 | ||
LU | 14.01.2017 | ||
SI | 15.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | BE | 13.04.2016 | |
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
GB | 14.01.2017 | ||
IE | 14.01.2017 | ||
LU | 14.01.2017 | ||
SI | 15.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | BE | 13.04.2016 | |
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
GB | 14.01.2017 | ||
IE | 14.01.2017 | ||
LU | 14.01.2017 | ||
SI | 15.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | BE | 13.04.2016 | |
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
GB | 14.01.2017 | ||
LU | 14.01.2017 | ||
SI | 15.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/47] | BE | 13.04.2016 | |
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 13.04.2016 | |
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | BE | 13.04.2016 | |
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | BE | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 13.04.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US6425322 (KARLSSON GOESTA [SE], et al) [X] 1-8,20 * column 4, line 11 - line 37 * * figures 7-9 * [A] 9,19 [Y] 18; | [XA]GB1549899 (FAHR AG MASCHF) [X] 1-4,6-8 * page 2, line 61 - line 87 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 9,12,16,17,19; | [XA]DE2807058 (BOLLMANN HEINRICH) [X] 1-8 * page 3 - page 4 * [A] 12,16,17,19; | [XA]DE3920377 (WELGER GEB [DE]) [X] 1-8 * column 1, line 55 - line 65 * * column 2, line 30 - line 57 * * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 8 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 12,16,17,19,20; | [XA]EP0745318 (MAASLAND NV [NL]) [X] 1-6 * column 1, line 22 - line 29 * * column 2, line 43 - line 58 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 16,17,20; | [YA]US2004000131 (VIAUD JEAN [FR], et al) [Y] 18 * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0032] * * figures 1,2 * [A] 1-6,20 |