EP1705225 - FLAME-RETARDANT AND FLAME-RETARDANT RESIN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.08.2012 [2012/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otsuka Chemical Co., Ltd. 2-27, Otedori 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-0021 / JP | [2010/30] |
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states Otsuka Chemical Holdings Co., Ltd. 2-27, Otedori 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-0021 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Minoru c/o OTSUKA CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 463, Kagasuno, Kawauchi-cho Tokushima-shi Tokushima 771-0193 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Daisuke c/o OTSUKA CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 463, Kagasuno, Kawauchi-cho Tokushima-shi Tokushima 771-0193 / JP | [2006/39] | Representative(s) | Merkle, Gebhard Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | Merkle, Gebhard TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05703308.6 | 05.01.2005 | [2006/39] | WO2005JP00035 | Priority number, date | JP20040009707 | 16.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004009707 | [2006/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005068558 | Date: | 28.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1705225 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08L101/00, C08K9/04, C08K7/00, C09C3/08, C01G23/00 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
C09K21/02 (EP,US);
C08K3/22 (KR);
B82Y30/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08L101/00 (KR);
C09C1/3676 (EP,US);
C09K21/14 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/39] | C08L101/00, C08K9/04, C08K7/00, C09C3/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLAMMSCHUTZMITTEL UND FLAMMGESCHÜTZTE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2006/39] | English: | FLAME-RETARDANT AND FLAME-RETARDANT RESIN COMPOSITION | [2006/39] | French: | COMPOSITION IGNIFUGE ET RESINE IGNIFUGE | [2006/39] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2006 | Translation filed | 25.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 25.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/39] | 17.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/33] | 15.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP1419994 (OTSUKA CHEM HOLDINGS CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1-3,20-21* paragraphs [0001] , [0 25] - [0026]; examples 1-16; claims 1, 4 * | International search | [Y]JPH10338796 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [A]JP3062497B ; | [Y]JP2001316564 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [Y]JP2002363194 (CHEMIPRO KASEI KAISHA LTD); | [X]JP2003138146 (OTSUKA CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [Y]JP2003342482 (POLYPLASTICS CO) |