EP1704848 - OILY CLEANSING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHISEIDO COMPANY, LTD. 5-5, Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | [2017/29] |
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states Shiseido Co., Ltd. 5-5, Ginza 7-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Kei, @Shiseido R. Center (Shin-Yokohama) 2-1, Hayabuchi 2-chome Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 224-8558 / JP | 02 /
MATSUO, Akira, @Shiseido R. Center (Shin-Yokohama) 2-1, Hayabuchi 2-chome Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2248558 / JP | 03 /
INOUE, Hiroki, @Shiseido R. Center (Shin-Yokohama) 2-1, Hayabuchi 2-chome Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2248558 / JP | [2017/30] |
Former [2006/39] | 01 /
WATANABE, Kei, Shiseido R. Center (Shin-Yokohama) 2-1, Hayabuchi 1-chome, Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2248558 / JP | ||
02 /
MATSUO, Akira, Shiseido R. Center (Shin-Yokohama) 2-1, Hayabuchi 2-chome Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2248558 / JP | |||
03 /
INOUE, Hiroki, Shiseido R. Center (Shin-Yokohama) 2-1, Hayabuchi 2-chome, Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2248558 / JP | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | Henkel, Breuer & Partner Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/41] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Patentanwälte Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/39] | Henkel, Feiler & Hänzel Maximiliansplatz 21 D-80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05703415.9 | 11.01.2005 | [2006/39] | WO2005JP00176 | Priority number, date | JP20040004055 | 09.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004004055 | [2006/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005079729 | Date: | 01.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1704848 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1704848 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.09.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/34, A61K8/36, A61K8/92, A61K8/02, A61K8/06, A61Q19/10 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
A61K8/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/0295 (EP,US);
A61K8/068 (EP,US);
A61K8/342 (EP,US);
A61K8/361 (EP,US);
A61K8/92 (EP,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/52] | A61K8/31, A61K8/37, A61K8/39, A61Q1/14, A61Q19/10, A61K8/891 | ||
Former IPC [2006/39] | A61K8/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2017/30] |
Former [2007/16] | DE, FR, IT | ||
Former [2006/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ÖLIGE REINIGUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2006/39] | English: | OILY CLEANSING COMPOSITION | [2006/39] | French: | COMPOSITION DEMAQUILLANTE HUILEUSE | [2006/39] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2006 | Translation filed | 04.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/39] | 28.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2252403 (HENKEL & CIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-8 * page 1, line 18 - page 2, line 22; examples 1-6; table I * * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 32 *; | [XI]GB2091100 (OREAL) [X] 1,4,8 * page 1, line 60 - page 2, line 85; examples 5,7,10,16; claim - * [I] 6,7; | [XI]US4921874 (FRANKE ROLF [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,8 * column 1, line 25 - column 2, line 2; claim - * [I] 3; | [XI]EP0557825 (MERZ & CO GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-4,8 * page 2, line 40 - page 4, line 34; examples 1,3; claim - *[I] 6,7; | [X]JPH1135421 (SHISEIDO CO LTD) [X] 1-8 * examples 10,11; table 3 * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0018] *; | [XI]DE19910704 (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,8 * page 8, line 5 - line 10; claim -; table 1 * * page 2, line 17 - line 35 * * page 2, line 58 - page 3, line 3 * * page 3, line 65 - page 4, line 60 * [I] 3,5; | [X]US6120759 (BOUILLON GUENTER [DE]) [X] 1-4,8 * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 5; examples II-IV; claim - * | International search | [X]JPS62108806 (KOBAYASHI KOOC KK); | [X]WO03080004 (KAO CORP [JP], et al) |