EP1708153 - SIGN DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lintec Corporation 23-23, Honcho, Itabashi-ku Tokyo 173-0001 / JP | [2006/46] |
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states Lintec Corporation 23-23, Honcho, Itabashi-ku Tokyo 173-0001 / JP | ||
For all designated states Iwasaki Electric Co., Ltd 12-4 Shiba 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0014 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAYAMA, Takeshi c/o Lintec Corporation 23-23, Honcho Itabashi-ku, Tokyo 1730001 / JP | 02 /
ABE, Akira c/o Lintec Corporation 23-23, Honcho Itabashi-ku, Tokyo 1730001 / JP | 03 /
SHIMIZU, Dai c/o Lintec Corporation 23-23, Honcho Itabashi-ku, Tokyo 1730001 / JP | 04 /
ITOSHIMA, Fumihiro 201, 1-22-2 Minamidai, Nagasuta, Midori-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken, 2260018 / JP | 05 /
HARADA, Kazuo c/o Iwasaki Electric Co., Ltd. Saitama Plant 1-1, Ichiriyamacho Gyouda-shi, Saitama 3618505 / JP | 06 /
ODA, Masahiro c/o Iwasaki Electric Co., Ltd. Saitama Plant 1-1, Ichiriyamacho Gyouda-shi, Saitama 3618505 / JP | 07 /
MAKII, Yasuhiro c/o. Iwasaki Electric Co., Ltd. 3-12-4, Shiba Minato-ku, Tokyo 1050014 / JP | [2006/52] |
Former [2006/40] | 01 /
NAKAYAMA, Takeshi c/o Lintec Corporation 23-23, Honcho Itabashi-ku, Tokyo 1730001 / JP | ||
02 /
ABE, Akira c/o Lintec Corporation 23-23, Honcho Itabashi-ku, Tokyo 1730001 / JP | |||
03 /
SHIMIZU, Dai c/o Lintec Corporation 23-23, Honcho Itabashi-ku, Tokyo 1730001 / JP | |||
04 /
ITOSHIMA, Fumihiro Japan Highway Public Corp. Shiki Shukusha 405 3-7-15, Kitano Niiza-shi, Saitama 3520003 / JP | |||
05 /
HARADA, Kazuo c/o Iwasaki Electric Co., Ltd. Saitama Plant 1-1, Ichiriyamacho Gyouda-shi, Saitama 3618505 / JP | |||
06 /
ODA, Masahiro c/o Iwasaki Electric Co., Ltd. Saitama Plant 1-1, Ichiriyamacho Gyouda-shi, Saitama 3618505 / JP | |||
07 /
MAKII, Yasuhiro c/o. Iwasaki Electric Co., Ltd. 3-12-4, Shiba Minato-ku, Tokyo 1050014 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/40] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05703805.1 | 19.01.2005 | [2006/40] | WO2005JP00568 | Priority number, date | JP20040010484 | 19.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004010484 | [2006/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005069257 | Date: | 28.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1708153 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G09F13/42, G09F13/02 | [2007/29] | CPC: |
G09F13/02 (EP,KR,US);
E01F9/615 (KR);
G09F13/42 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/40] | G09F13/42 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2007/17] |
Former [2006/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHILD-EINRICHTUNG | [2006/40] | English: | SIGN DEVICE | [2006/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SIGNALISATION | [2006/40] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2006 | Translation filed | 19.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 19.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/40] | 07.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/28] | 21.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.09.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]JPH06314505 (SHIINA KK); | [Y]JPH11224067 (RUMINOOBA SEIKO KK); | [Y]JP2000215703 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [Y]JPH09161722 (IWASAKI ELECTRIC CO LTD) |