EP1713268 - DATA BROADCAST RECORDING/REPRODUCING METHOD, DEVICE, AND RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | For all designated states Renesas Electronics Corporation 1753, Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa / JP | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | ||
For all designated states Renesas Electronics Corporation 1753, Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa / JP | |||
For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | |||
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | ||
For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | |||
For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | |||
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | ||
For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | |||
For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITOI, Satoshi NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 1088001 / JP | 02 /
SAKAI, Noriaki, NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 2118668 / JP | 03 /
NAKASHIKA, Masahiro, Intellectual Property Div. Toshiba Corp., 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 1058001 / JP | 04 /
TSUMAGARI, Yasufumi, Intellectual Property Div. Toshiba Corp., 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 1058001 / JP | 05 /
KIKUCHI, Shinichi, Intellectual Property Div. Toshiba Corp., 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 1058001 / JP | [2006/42] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/42] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05704148.5 | 20.01.2005 | [2006/42] | WO2005JP01038 | Priority number, date | JP20040012264 | 20.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004012264 | [2006/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005074269 | Date: | 11.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1713268 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/91, H04N5/85, G11B20/10, G11B20/12, G11B27/00 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
H04N5/91 (KR);
G11B21/10 (KR);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B27/322 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/4147 (EP,US);
H04N21/42646 (EP,US);
H04N21/42661 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04N21/8133 (EP,US);
H04N5/76 (EP,US);
H04N7/08 (KR);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US);
H04N5/781 (EP,US);
H04N5/85 (EP,US);
H04N9/7921 (EP,US);
H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
H04N9/8216 (EP,US);
H04N9/8227 (EP,US);
H04N9/8233 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/17] |
Former [2006/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENRUNDSENDE-AUFZEICHNUNGS-/ -WIEDERGABEVERFAHREN, EINRICHTUNG UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2006/42] | English: | DATA BROADCAST RECORDING/REPRODUCING METHOD, DEVICE, AND RECORDING MEDIUM | [2006/42] | French: | PROCEDE , DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT / REPRODUCTION DE LA DIFFUSION DES DONNEES, ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2006/42] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2006 | Translation filed | 08.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 08.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 08.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 03.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/23] | 19.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0939405 (NEC CORP [JP]) [I] 1-7,20,21 * figures 5,6 * * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0020] - [0029] *; | [I]EP1014715 (NEC CORP [JP]) [I] 1-7,20,21 * paragraphs [0044] , [0045] , [0059] , [0060] , [0088] *; | [I]US2002042920 (THOMAS WILLIAM L [US], et al) [I] 1-7,20,21 * figure 3 * * paragraphs [0036] - [0045] - [0059] , [0067] *; | [I]EP1330121 (UNITED VIDEO PROPERTIES INC [US]) [I] 1-7,20,21 * figure 15 * * paragraphs [0050] , [0051] *; | [A]WO03065711 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]US2003219227 (OTALA TAPANI [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * figure 6 * * paragraphs [0014] - [0016] - [0020] *; | US2005180580 [ ] (MURABAYASHI NOBORU [JP], et al) [ ] * figure 14 ** paragraphs [0176] - [0181] * | International search | [X]JP2002170361 (NEC CORP); | [A]JP2003288767 (NEC CORP); | [A]JP2001061130 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |