EP1722381 - COIL AND BOBBIN FOR COIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 3-9-1, Shibaura Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0023 / JP | [2013/40] |
Former [2006/46] | For all designated states TDK Corporation 1-13-1, Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEZAWA, Akira c/o Tdk Corporation, 1-13-1, Nihonbashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 1038272 / JP | [2006/46] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | Wilson, Peter, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2006/46] | Feakins, Graham Allan RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK RAWORTH HOUSE 36 Sydenham Road Croydon, Surrey CRO 2EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 05704161.8 | 27.01.2005 | [2006/46] | WO2005JP01054 | Priority number, date | JP20040024319 | 30.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004024319 | [2006/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005073991 | Date: | 11.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1722381 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1722381 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/32, H01F5/02 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
H01F27/325 (EP,KR,US);
H01F27/2852 (EP,KR,US);
H01F5/02 (EP,KR,US);
H01F2027/2861 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/30] |
Former [2006/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SPULE UND SPULENKÖRPER FÜR EINE SPULE | [2006/46] | English: | COIL AND BOBBIN FOR COIL | [2006/46] | French: | BOBINE ELECTRIQUE ET BOBINE ISOLANTE POUR BOBINE ELECTRIQUE | [2006/46] | Entry into regional phase | 15.08.2006 | Translation filed | 15.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 15.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 15.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 19.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   05.02.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.01.2005 | AT | 26.07.2017 | CY | 26.07.2017 | CZ | 26.07.2017 | DK | 26.07.2017 | EE | 26.07.2017 | ES | 26.07.2017 | FI | 26.07.2017 | IT | 26.07.2017 | LT | 26.07.2017 | MC | 26.07.2017 | NL | 26.07.2017 | PL | 26.07.2017 | PT | 26.07.2017 | RO | 26.07.2017 | SE | 26.07.2017 | SI | 26.07.2017 | SK | 26.07.2017 | TR | 26.07.2017 | BG | 26.10.2017 | GR | 27.10.2017 | IS | 26.11.2017 | GB | 27.01.2018 | IE | 27.01.2018 | LU | 27.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | FR | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 27.01.2005 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PT | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
GB | 27.01.2018 | ||
IE | 27.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
GB | 27.01.2018 | ||
IE | 27.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
GB | 27.01.2018 | ||
IE | 27.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
GB | 27.01.2018 | ||
IE | 27.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
GB | 27.01.2018 | ||
IE | 27.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
GB | 27.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
GB | 27.01.2018 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
LU | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 26.07.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1287692 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1-12 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 20; figure 2 *; | [A]US4549158 (MITSUI TADASHI [JP], et al) [A] 3-5 * abstract *; | [A]JPH06151207 (TDK CORP) [A] 2-5 * abstract *; | [A]EP0671749 (ALCATEL NV [NL]); | [A]US5886610 (CANOVA ANTONIO [IT]); | [A]US5949191 (CASSESE BRUNO [FR], et al) [A] 8-12 * abstract *; | [A]US6222437 (SOTO LOUIS A [US], et al) [A] 4 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPS5222550U ; | [Y]JPH0621230U ; | [Y]JP2000164430 (TOGO SEISAKUSHO KK, et al); | [Y]JPH06151207 (TDK CORP); | [A]JP2002146240 (HITACHI LTD, et al) |