EP1843223 - HOLOGRAM RECORDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/41] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIKAWA, Hiroyasu c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 2118588 / JP | 02 /
TEZUKA, Kouichi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 2118588 / JP | 03 /
UNO, Kazushi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 2118588 / JP | [2007/41] | Representative(s) | Seeger, Wolfgang Seeger & Seeger Patentanwälte & European Patent Attorneys Georg-Hager-Strasse 40 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/41] | Seeger, Wolfgang Georg-Hager-Strasse 40 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05704179.0 | 27.01.2005 | [2007/41] | WO2005JP01073 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006080061 | Date: | 03.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1843223 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G03H1/04, G11B7/0065, G11B7/135, G11C13/04 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
G03H1/0404 (EP,US);
G11B7/1395 (EP,US);
G11C13/042 (EP,US);
G03H1/0402 (EP,US);
G03H2001/0415 (EP,US);
G03H2223/13 (EP,US);
G03H2223/17 (EP,US);
G03H2225/24 (EP,US);
G03H2250/42 (EP,US);
G11B7/0065 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/08] |
Former [2007/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOLOGRAM-AUFZEICHNUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2007/41] | English: | HOLOGRAM RECORDING DEVICE | [2007/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT D'HOLOGRAMME | [2007/41] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2007 | Translation filed | 31.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 28.08.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.09.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11311937 (HORIGOME HIDEYOSHI) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9957719 (OPTILINK AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 10, line 17 - page 11, line 16; figure 2 *; | [A]WO0033142 (OPTILINK AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 9, line 8 - line 19; figure 2a *; | [A]EP1351226 (OPTWARE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0041]; figure 4 *; | [A]JP2004030734 (OPTWARE KK) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004102542 (OPTWARE CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004263924 (CHAO TIEN-HSIN [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0046] , [0049]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1624451 (OPTWARE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0072] - [0074] - [0079] , [0101] , [0106]; figure 1 * | International search | [X]JPH11311937 (HORIGOME HIDEYOSHI); | [A]JP2004030734 (OPTWARE KK) |