EP1734012 - GAS-LIQUID DISSOLUTION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Matsuedoken Co. Ltd. 3-5, Gakuenminami 2-chome, Matsue-shi, Shimane 6900826 / JP | For all designated states Inc. A. Agency P. W. Research Inst. 1-6, Minamihara, Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 3058516 / JP | [2006/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITASAKO, Hiroshi MATSUEDOKEN CO., LTD. 3-5,Gaku enminami 2-chome Matsue-shi, Shimane 6900826 / JP | 02 /
KATSUBE, Masao MATSUEDOKEN CO., LTD. 3-5, Gakuenminami 2-chome Matsue-shi, Shimane 6900826 / JP | 03 /
SAKAMOTO, Katsuhiro MATSUEDOKEN CO., LTD. 3-5, Gakuenminami 2-chome Matsue-shi, Shimane 6900826 / JP | 04 /
SAGO, Junzo INC. A. AGENCY PUB. WORKS RESEARCH INST. 4-605 Gokuraku,Meito -ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 4650053 / JP | 05 /
TANAKA, Hiroaki INC. A. AGENCY PUBL. WORKS RES. INST. 1-6, Minamihara Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 3058516 / JP | 06 /
TSUMORI, Jun INC. A. AGENCY PUBL. WORKS RES. INST. 1-20-19-305 Noge Setagaya-ku ITokyo, 1580092 / JP | [2013/30] |
Former [2007/16] | 01 /
KITASAKO, Hiroshi, MATSUEDOKEN CO., LTD. 3-5,Gaku enminami 2-chome Matsue-shi, Shimane 6900826 / JP | ||
02 /
KATSUBE, Masao, MATSUEDOKEN CO., LTD. 3-5, Gakuenminami 2-chome Matsue-shi, Shimane 6900826 / JP | |||
03 /
SAKAMOTO, Katsuhiro, MATSUEDOKEN CO., LTD. 3-5, Gakuenminami 2-chome Matsue-shi, Shimane 6900826 / JP | |||
04 /
SAGO, J., INC. A. AGENCY PUB. WORKS RESEARCH INST. 4-605 Gokuraku,Meito -ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 4650053 / JP | |||
05 /
TANAKA, H., INC. A. AGENCY PUBL. WORKS RES. INST. 1-6, Minamihara Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 3058516 / JP | |||
06 /
TSUMORI, J., INC. A. AGENCY PUBL. WORKS RES. INST. 1-20-19-305 Noge Setagaya-ku ITokyo, 1580092 / JP | |||
Former [2006/51] | 01 /
KITASAKO, Hiroshi, MATSUEDOKEN CO., LTD. 3-5,Gaku enminami 2-chome Matsue-shi, Shimane 6900826 / JP | ||
02 /
KATSUBE, Masao, MATSUEDOKEN CO., LTD. 3-5, Gakuenminami 2-chome Matsue-shi, Shimane 6900826 / JP | |||
03 /
SAKAMOTO, Katsuhiro, MATSUEDOKEN CO., LTD. 3-5, Gakuenminami 2-chome Matsue-shi, Shimane 6900826 / JP | |||
04 /
SAGO, J., INC. A. AGENCY PUB. WORKS RESEARCH INST. 1-6, Minamihara Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 3058516 / JP | |||
05 /
TANAKA, H., INC. A. AGENCY PUBL. WORKS RES. INST. 1-6, Minamihara Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 3058516 / JP | |||
06 /
TSUMORI, J., INC. A. AGENCY PUBL. WORKS RES. INST. 1-6, Minamihara Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 3058516 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/49] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/24] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/51] | Wiedemann, Peter Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05704266.5 | 28.01.2005 | [2006/51] | WO2005JP01268 | Priority number, date | JP20040027318 | 03.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004027318 | [2006/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005075365 | Date: | 18.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1734012 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1734012 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01F1/00, B01F3/04, B01F5/02 | [2013/28] | CPC: |
B01F21/20 (EP,US);
B01F25/25 (EP,US);
B01F23/232 (EP,US);
B01F23/237612 (EP,US);
B01F2101/305 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/51] | C02F3/20, C02F7/00, B01F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/51] | Title | German: | GAS-FLÜSSIGKEITS-LÖSUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2006/51] | English: | GAS-LIQUID DISSOLUTION APPARATUS | [2006/51] | French: | APPAREIL DE DISSOLUTION DE GAZ DANS UN LIQUIDE | [2006/51] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2006 | Translation filed | 02.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 02.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 15.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.01.2005 | AT | 04.12.2013 | BE | 04.12.2013 | BG | 04.12.2013 | CY | 04.12.2013 | CZ | 04.12.2013 | DK | 04.12.2013 | EE | 04.12.2013 | ES | 04.12.2013 | FI | 04.12.2013 | IT | 04.12.2013 | LT | 04.12.2013 | MC | 04.12.2013 | NL | 04.12.2013 | PL | 04.12.2013 | RO | 04.12.2013 | SE | 04.12.2013 | SI | 04.12.2013 | SK | 04.12.2013 | TR | 04.12.2013 | IE | 28.01.2014 | LU | 28.01.2014 | CH | 31.01.2014 | LI | 31.01.2014 | FR | 04.02.2014 | GB | 04.03.2014 | GR | 05.03.2014 | IS | 04.04.2014 | PT | 04.04.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 28.01.2005 | |
AT | 04.12.2013 | ||
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
FR | 04.02.2014 | ||
GB | 04.03.2014 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
FR | 04.02.2014 | ||
GB | 04.03.2014 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
FR | 04.02.2014 | ||
GB | 04.03.2014 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
FR | 04.02.2014 | ||
GB | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
FR | 04.02.2014 | ||
GB | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
FR | 04.02.2014 | ||
GB | 04.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
FR | 04.02.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
FR | 04.02.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
BE | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 04.12.2013 | |
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 04.12.2013 | |
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 04.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2094778 (JAMES ALEXANDER) [X] 9,11,12 * figure 2 * * page 2, column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 22 * [A] 1-8,10,13 [I] 14,15; | [A]US3653182 (WELCH LOUIS S) [A] 2,10 * abstract ** figure 2 *; | [XAI]US4107240 (VERNER BO LENNART, et al) [X] 1,2,6,9,10 * abstract * * column 4, line 1 - line 63 * * figures 3,4 * [A] 4,5,7,8,12-15 [I] 3,11; | [XAI]US4534862 (ZLOKARNIK MARKO [DE]) [X] 9,10 * abstract * * figure 8 * * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 2 * [A] 1-8,12-15 [I] 11 | International search | [A]JP2002273183 (NIKUNI KK); | [A]JP2003053168 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2003340251 (FUJISATO RYOSAKU, et al) | by applicant | US4107240 | JPH05168981 | JPH07185281 | JPH11207162 | JP2000245295 | JP2002177953 | JP2002200415 | JP2002346351 |