EP1706354 - METHOD OF PRODUCING GUANYLUREADINITRAMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/40] | METHOD OF PRODUCING SALTS OF DINITRAMIDIC ACID | ||
[2015/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FÖRSVARETS MATERIELVERK S-115 88 Stockholm / SE | [2006/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VÖRDE, Carin Sjögatan 2 S-691 41 Karlskoga / SE | 02 /
SKIFS, Henrik Sandviksvägen 4a S-691 52 Karlskoga / SE | [2006/40] | Representative(s) | Hedefält, Dag Försvarets Materielverk Patentenheten 115 88 Stockholm / SE | [2016/30] |
Former [2010/08] | Hedefält, Dag Försvarets Materielverk Patentenheten 115 88 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2010/07] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2006/40] | Söderström, Bengt Ake Försvarets Materielverk Patentenheten 115 88 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 05704733.4 | 21.01.2005 | [2006/40] | WO2005SE00060 | Priority number, date | SE20040000117 | 21.01.2004 Original published format: SE 0400117 | [2006/40] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005070823 | Date: | 04.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1706354 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1706354 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 04.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C06B25/34, C01B21/082 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
C01B21/082 (EP,NO,US);
C06B25/34 (EP,NO,US);
Y10S149/122 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/40] | C01B21/082 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/30] |
Former [2006/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GUANYLHARNSTOFF-DINITRAMID | [2015/24] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING GUANYLUREADINITRAMIDE | [2015/24] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE GUANYLUREADINITRAMIDE | [2015/24] |
Former [2006/40] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SALZEN VON DINITRAMIDSÄURE | ||
Former [2006/40] | METHOD OF PRODUCING SALTS OF DINITRAMIDIC ACID | ||
Former [2006/40] | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE SELS D'ACIDE DINITRAMIDIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/40] | 24.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 27.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/27] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 16.11.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 16.11.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.11.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.04.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 16.04.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.04.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.01.2005 | AT | 27.07.2016 | BE | 27.07.2016 | CY | 27.07.2016 | CZ | 27.07.2016 | DK | 27.07.2016 | EE | 27.07.2016 | ES | 27.07.2016 | FI | 27.07.2016 | IT | 27.07.2016 | LT | 27.07.2016 | MC | 27.07.2016 | NL | 27.07.2016 | PL | 27.07.2016 | RO | 27.07.2016 | SE | 27.07.2016 | SI | 27.07.2016 | SK | 27.07.2016 | TR | 27.07.2016 | BG | 27.10.2016 | GR | 28.10.2016 | IS | 27.11.2016 | PT | 28.11.2016 | IE | 21.01.2017 | LU | 21.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 21.01.2005 | |
AT | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CY | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 21.01.2017 | ||
LU | 21.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 21.01.2005 | |
AT | 27.07.2016 | ||
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 21.01.2017 | ||
LU | 21.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
IE | 21.01.2017 | ||
LU | 21.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
LU | 21.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
MC | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SI | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2016 | ||
DK | 27.07.2016 | ||
EE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
RO | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
SK | 27.07.2016 | ||
BG | 27.10.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 27.07.2016 | |
BE | 27.07.2016 | ||
ES | 27.07.2016 | ||
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.10.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
PT | 28.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 27.07.2016 | |
FI | 27.07.2016 | ||
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
PL | 27.07.2016 | ||
SE | 27.07.2016 | ||
IS | 27.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 27.07.2016 | |
IT | 27.07.2016 | ||
LT | 27.07.2016 | ||
NL | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 27.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9316002 (STANFORD RES INST INT [US]); | [A]WO9706099 (FOERSVARETS FORSKNINGSANSTALT [SE], et al); | [A]WO9946202 (FOERSVARETS FORSKNINGSANSTALT [SE], et al); | [A]EP1344748 (COUNCIL SCIENT IND RES [IN]) | Examination | WO9855428 | by applicant | EP0843647 | WO9946202 |