EP1841684 - ADMINISTERING OF FLOWABLE PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANAX Sweden AB Smultronvägen 1 782 34 Malung / SE | [2007/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISS, Jan Anders Smultronvägen 1 78234 Malung / SE | 02 /
NISS, Alexander Smultronvägen 3 78234 Malung / SE | 03 /
NISS, Andreas Smultronvagen 1 SE - 782 34 MALUNG / SE | [2007/46] |
Former [2007/41] | 01 /
NISS, Jan Anders Smultronvägen 1 78234 Malung / SE | ||
02 /
NISS, Alexander Smultronvägen 3 78234 Malung / SE | |||
03 /
NISS, Andreas Södra Mon 1239 78233 Malung / SE | Representative(s) | Andrén, Bertil, et al L-O Lundquist Patentbyrå AB Box 80 651 03 Karlstad / SE | [2014/07] |
Former [2013/51] | Lundquist, Lars-Olof L-O Lundquist Patentbyra AB Box 80 651 03 Karlstad / SE | ||
Former [2007/41] | Lundquist, Lars-Olof L-O Lundquist Patentbyra AB Box 80 651 03 Karlstad / SE | Application number, filing date | 05704743.3 | 24.01.2005 | [2007/41] | WO2005SE00070 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006078196 | Date: | 27.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1841684 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1841684 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 27.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B67D7/02, B67D7/46, B05C17/01 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
G01F11/021 (EP,US);
B05C17/0103 (EP,US);
B67D1/0012 (EP,US);
B67D1/0085 (EP,US);
B67D1/108 (EP,US);
B67D1/1222 (EP,US);
B67D2001/0812 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/41] | B67D5/02, B67D5/46, B05C17/01 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/41] | Title | German: | VERABREICHUNG VON FLIESSFÄHIGEN PRODUKTEN | [2007/41] | English: | ADMINISTERING OF FLOWABLE PRODUCTS | [2007/41] | French: | GESTION DE PRODUITS FLUIDES | [2007/41] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 09.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 24.08.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   04.10.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.01.2005 | AT | 18.12.2013 | BE | 18.12.2013 | BG | 18.12.2013 | CY | 18.12.2013 | CZ | 18.12.2013 | DK | 18.12.2013 | EE | 18.12.2013 | ES | 18.12.2013 | FI | 18.12.2013 | IT | 18.12.2013 | LT | 18.12.2013 | MC | 18.12.2013 | NL | 18.12.2013 | PL | 18.12.2013 | RO | 18.12.2013 | SE | 18.12.2013 | SI | 18.12.2013 | SK | 18.12.2013 | TR | 18.12.2013 | IE | 24.01.2014 | LU | 24.01.2014 | CH | 31.01.2014 | LI | 31.01.2014 | FR | 18.02.2014 | GB | 18.03.2014 | GR | 19.03.2014 | IS | 18.04.2014 | PT | 18.04.2014 | DE | 01.08.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 24.01.2005 | |
AT | 18.12.2013 | ||
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
IT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 24.01.2014 | ||
LU | 24.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
FR | 18.02.2014 | ||
GB | 18.03.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
DE | 01.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
IT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 24.01.2014 | ||
LU | 24.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
FR | 18.02.2014 | ||
GB | 18.03.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
DE | 01.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 24.01.2014 | ||
LU | 24.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
FR | 18.02.2014 | ||
GB | 18.03.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
DE | 01.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 24.01.2014 | ||
LU | 24.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
FR | 18.02.2014 | ||
GB | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
DE | 01.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 24.01.2014 | ||
LU | 24.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
FR | 18.02.2014 | ||
GB | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
DE | 01.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 24.01.2014 | ||
LU | 24.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
FR | 18.02.2014 | ||
GB | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
DE | 01.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 24.01.2014 | ||
LU | 24.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
FR | 18.02.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
DE | 01.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
LU | 24.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
FR | 18.02.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
DE | 01.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
LU | 24.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
DE | 01.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
LU | 24.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
DE | 01.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
LU | 24.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
LU | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
LU | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | BE | 18.12.2013 | |
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | BE | 18.12.2013 | |
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 18.12.2013 | |
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 18.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5934509 (NISS JAN-ANDERS [SE]); | [A]US5366117 (MESENBRING JOHN M [US], et al); | [A]US2002166880 (TAYLOR-MCCUNE CHRISTOPHER J [US]); | [A]US3984033 (GROTH HUGH F, et al); | [A]US3285202 (JOHN MACMANUS) |