EP1713820 - SELECTIVE ESTROGEN RECEPTOR MODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/43] | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis IN 46285 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DODGE, Jeffrey, Alan 7110 Lantern Road Indianapolis, Indiana 46256 / US | 02 /
HOPKINS, Randall, Bruce 956 North Audubon Road Indianapolis, Indiana 46219 / US | 03 /
WALLACE, Owen, Brendan 4341 Chase Circle Zionsville, Indiana 46077 / US | [2006/43] | Representative(s) | Burnside, Ivan John Eli Lilly and Company Limited 8 Arlington Square West Downshire Way Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 1PU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/43] | Burnside, Ivan John Eli Lilly and Company Limited European Patent Operations Lilly Research Centre Erl Wood Manor, Sunnighill Road Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 05704873.8 | 18.01.2005 | [2006/43] | WO2005US00019 | Priority number, date | US20040538302P | 22.01.2004 Original published format: US 538302 P | [2006/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005073244 | Date: | 11.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1713820 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07J73/00, A61K31/56, A61P5/32 | [2006/43] | CPC: |
C07J73/003 (EP);
A61P5/32 (EP);
C07J73/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELEKTIVE ÖSTROGEN-REZEPTOR-MODULATOREN | [2006/43] | English: | SELECTIVE ESTROGEN RECEPTOR MODULATORS | [2006/43] | French: | MODULATEURS SELECTIFS DU RECEPTEUR DES OESTROGENES | [2006/43] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 21.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/52] | 09.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0761669 (LILLY CO ELI [US]) [Y] 1-21 * claim 1 * * page 43; example 11b *; | [Y]WO03053977 (ORTHO MCNEIL PHARM INC [US]) [Y] 1-21 * claim 1 * | [Y] - GRESE T A ET AL, "Synthesis and pharmacology of conformationally restricted raloxifene analogues: highly potent selective estrogen receptor modulators", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, (1998), vol. 41, no. 8, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 1272 - 1283, XP002208889 [Y] 1-21 * page 1274; compound 4 * |