EP1706141 - METHODS OF USING BOTULINUM TOXIN FOR THE TREATMENT OF HYPERVOLEMIC LIP DEFORMITY (LIP ECTROPION) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 09.03.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Botulinum Toxin Research Associates, Inc. 1261 Furnace Brook Parkway Quincy, MA 02168 / US | [2009/31] |
Former [2006/40] | For all designated states Botulinum Toxin Research Associates, Inc. 1261 Furnace Brook Parkway Quincy Massachusetts 02169 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORODIC, Gary, E. 90 Kensington Road Canton, MA 02021 / US | [2006/40] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/40] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05704951.2 | 05.01.2005 | [2006/40] | WO2005US00117 | Priority number, date | US20040534330P | 05.01.2004 Original published format: US 534330 P | [2006/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005067967 | Date: | 28.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1706141 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1706141 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/48, A61K8/02, A61K8/64, A61Q19/00 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
A61K8/64 (EP,US);
A61K38/4893 (EP,US);
A61K8/02 (EP,US);
A61Q19/001 (EP,US);
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
A61K2800/91 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/40] | A61K39/08, A61K38/16, A61Q1/06, C07K14/33 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG VON BOTULINUSTOXIN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HYPERVOLÄMISCHER LIPPENDEFORMITÄT (LIPPEN-EKTROPION) | [2006/40] | English: | METHODS OF USING BOTULINUM TOXIN FOR THE TREATMENT OF HYPERVOLEMIC LIP DEFORMITY (LIP ECTROPION) | [2006/40] | French: | METHODES D'UTILISATION DE TOXINES DE BOTULINUM POUR TRAITER L'HYPERTROPHIE DE LA LEVRE (ECTROPION DE LA LEVRE) | [2006/40] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/40] | 18.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.09.2010
11.11.2010
ADMISSIBLE Merz Pharma GmbH & Co. KGaA Eckenheimer Landstrasse 100 60318 Frankfurt/Main / DE Opponent's representative Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.09.2010
Merz Pharma GmbH & Co. KGaA Eckenheimer Landstrasse 100 60318 Frankfurt/Main / DE Opponent's representative Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Foerstl Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | 17.11.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.05.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.11.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.12.2011 | 25.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 05.12.2011 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2012/15] | 15.12.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.12.2009 | BE | 09.12.2009 | CY | 09.12.2009 | CZ | 09.12.2009 | DK | 09.12.2009 | EE | 09.12.2009 | FI | 09.12.2009 | LT | 09.12.2009 | NL | 09.12.2009 | PL | 09.12.2009 | RO | 09.12.2009 | SE | 09.12.2009 | SI | 09.12.2009 | SK | 09.12.2009 | IE | 05.01.2010 | LU | 05.01.2010 | CH | 31.01.2010 | LI | 31.01.2010 | MC | 31.01.2010 | BG | 09.03.2010 | GR | 10.03.2010 | IS | 09.04.2010 | PT | 09.04.2010 | HU | 10.06.2010 | [2012/43] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 05.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
HU | 10.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 05.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
BE | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
NL | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
IS | 09.04.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 09.12.2009 | |
LT | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | LT | 09.12.2009 | |
SE | 09.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]CA2280565 (CARRUTHERS JEAN D A [CA], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 2 * * page 6, line 15 - page 7, line 20 *; | [PX]WO2004060384 (BOTULINUM TOXIN RES ASS INC [US]) [PX] 1-20 * page 9, paragraph 2 * * page 10, lines 4,5 ** page 10, paragraph L - page 16, paragraph L *; | [X] - FAGIEN STEVEN, "Botulinum toxin type A for facial aesthetic enhancement: role in facial shaping.", PLASTIC AND RECONSTRUCTIVE SURGERY. OCT 2003, (200310), vol. 112, no. 5 Suppl, ISSN 0032-1052, pages 6S - 20S, XP008046806 [X] 9-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/01.PRS.0000082189.88054.35 | [A] - KANE MICHAEL A C, "The effect of botulinum toxin injections on the nasolabial fold.", PLASTIC AND RECONSTRUCTIVE SURGERY. OCT 2003, (200310), vol. 112, no. 5 Suppl, ISSN 0032-1052, pages 66S - 72S, XP008046803 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/01.PRS.0000082195.44980.10 | [A] - SPÓSITO M MATILDE M, "New indications for botulinum toxin type a in cosmetics: mouth and neck.", PLASTIC AND RECONSTRUCTIVE SURGERY. AUG 2002, (200208), vol. 110, no. 2, ISSN 0032-1052, pages 601 - 613, XP008046793 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00006534-200208000-00037 | [A] - MATARASSO S L ET AL, "Treatment guidelines for botulinum toxin type A for the periocular region and a report on partial upper lip ptosis following injections to the lateral canthal rhytids.", PLASTIC AND RECONSTRUCTIVE SURGERY. JUL 2001, (200107), vol. 108, no. 1, ISSN 0032-1052, pages 208 - 217, XP008046805 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00006534-200107000-00033 |