EP1750986 - IMPROVED INTERIOR CONTOUR FOR BORE OF FRICTION SUPPORT BEARING OF A RAILWAY LOCOMOTIVE TRACTION MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magnus Division of LV Ventures, Inc. 1300 Morningside Road Fremont NE 68026-1029 / US | [2012/44] |
Former [2007/07] | For all designated states Magnus Division of LV Ventures, Inc. 1300 Morningside Fremont NE 68026-1029 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIEN, Paul 4808 Northcott Downers Grove, IL 60515 / US | 02 /
FOSTER, Robert, B. 1227 Asbury Road Erie, PA 16505 / US | 03 /
MACKLIN, John, E. 2507 Estes Lane Fremont, NE 68025 / US | [2007/07] | Representative(s) | Ruschke, Hans Edvard Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/36] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/07] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05705396.9 | 10.01.2005 | [2007/07] | WO2005US00711 | Priority number, date | US20040862114 | 03.06.2004 Original published format: US 862114 | [2007/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005120919 | Date: | 22.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1750986 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1750986 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B61C9/38, F16C23/04 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
F16C23/041 (EP,US);
B61C9/38 (EP,US);
F16C17/02 (EP);
F16C2240/30 (EP,US);
F16C2240/40 (EP,US);
F16C2326/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/07] | B61C1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/07] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE INNENKONTUR FÜR DIE BOHRUNG EINES REIBSTÜTZLAGERS EINES LOKOMOTIVEN-BAHNMOTORS | [2007/07] | English: | IMPROVED INTERIOR CONTOUR FOR BORE OF FRICTION SUPPORT BEARING OF A RAILWAY LOCOMOTIVE TRACTION MOTOR | [2007/07] | French: | CONTOUR INTERIEUR AMELIORE POUR UN ALESAGE D'UN PALIER-SUPPORT A FROTTEMENT D'UN MOTEUR DE TRACTION DE LOCOMOTIVE FERROVIAIRE | [2007/07] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/07] | 31.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.01.2005 | AT | 31.10.2012 | BE | 31.10.2012 | CY | 31.10.2012 | CZ | 31.10.2012 | DK | 31.10.2012 | EE | 31.10.2012 | FI | 31.10.2012 | IT | 31.10.2012 | LT | 31.10.2012 | NL | 31.10.2012 | PL | 31.10.2012 | RO | 31.10.2012 | SE | 31.10.2012 | SI | 31.10.2012 | SK | 31.10.2012 | TR | 31.10.2012 | IE | 10.01.2013 | LU | 10.01.2013 | BG | 31.01.2013 | CH | 31.01.2013 | LI | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | GR | 01.02.2013 | ES | 11.02.2013 | IS | 28.02.2013 | PT | 28.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
TR | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 10.01.2013 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
IE | 10.01.2013 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
IT | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
RO | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
EE | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
SK | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
DK | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
BG | 31.01.2013 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 31.10.2012 | |
BE | 31.10.2012 | ||
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
PT | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
SI | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 31.10.2012 | ||
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
GR | 01.02.2013 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 31.10.2012 | |
FI | 31.10.2012 | ||
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
PL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 31.10.2012 | |
LT | 31.10.2012 | ||
NL | 31.10.2012 | ||
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
ES | 11.02.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 31.10.2012 | |
SE | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 31.10.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US4940002 (BIEN PAUL R [US]); | [Y]US4995735 (DANSDILL TERENCE J [US]); | [A]US6626063 (KILLION DAVID L [US]); | [A]US2204515 (WILHELM STAHLECKER) | by applicant | US4940002 |