EP1703797 - TRICYCLIC MODULATORS OF THE GLUCOCORTICOID RECEPTOR, AP-1, AND/OR NF-[kappa]B ACTIVITY AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company P.O. Box 4000, Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEINSTEIN, David, S. 10 Iverness Lane East Windsor, NJ 08520 / US | 02 /
YANG, Bingwei Vera 15 Regents Court Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US | 03 /
KIM, Soong-Hoon 3 Lupine Lane Titusville, NJ 08560 / US | 04 /
VACCARO, Wayne 1706 Westover Road Yardley, PA 19067 / US | 05 /
SHEPPECK, James 356 Crittenden Dr. Newton, PA 18940 / US | 06 /
GILMORE, John 815 Hudson Dr. Yardley, PA 19067 / US | [2006/39] | Representative(s) | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/41] | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2008/45] | Howard, Paul Nicholas, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/39] | Howard, Paul Nicholas, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05705688.9 | 14.01.2005 | [2006/39] | WO2005US01180 | Priority number, date | US20040537469P | 16.01.2004 Original published format: US 537469 P | US20050035176 | 13.01.2005 Original published format: US 35176 | [2006/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005072132 | Date: | 11.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1703797 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07C233/58, C07D277/46, C07D417/12, C07D453/06, C07D405/12, A23K1/165, A23K1/18, C07D233/88 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
C07D417/12 (EP,US);
A23K20/168 (US);
A23K50/40 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
C07D233/88 (EP,US);
C07D277/46 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/03] | C07C233/58 | ||
Former IPC [2006/39] | A21D2/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | 03.08.2006 | LV | 03.08.2006 | MK | 03.08.2006 | YU | 03.08.2006 | Title | German: | TRICYCLISCHE MODULATOREN DER GLUCOCORTICOIDREZEPTOR AP-1 UND/ODER NF-KAPPA-B-AKTIVITÄT UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2006/39] | English: | TRICYCLIC MODULATORS OF THE GLUCOCORTICOID RECEPTOR, AP-1, AND/OR NF-[kappa]B ACTIVITY AND USE THEREOF | [2006/39] | French: | MODULATEURS TRICYCLIQUES DU RECEPTEUR GLUCOCORTICOIDE AP-1, ET/OU DE L'ACTIVITE DE NF-_G(K)B, ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2006/39] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2006 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/39] | 07.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/14] | 11.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9915493 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,21 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 6; example 9; claims 1,3 *; | [A]WO03007949 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1,21 * claims 1,17 *; | [PA]WO2004009017 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al) [PA] 1,21 * claims 1-22 *; | [E]WO2005073221 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al) [E] 1* page 72, step 2* | International search | [Y]US3317387 (PRICHARD WILLIAM W); | [X] - BUTLER DN ET AL, CANADIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY., (1972), vol. 50, pages 795 - 802, XP008112591 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1139/v72-124 | Examination | WO0066522 | by applicant | US5202486 | US5447954 | US5595872 | EP0818448 | US5712279 | US5739135 | US5760246 | US5827875 | US5885983 | US5962440 | WO0038722 | WO0066522 | WO02051851 | WO2004009017 | - BALDWIN, AS, JOURNAL OF CLIN. INVESTIGATION, (2001), vol. 107, page 3 | - FIRESTEIN, G.S., MANNING, A.M., ARTHRITIS AND RHEUMATISM, (1999), vol. 42, page 609 | - PELTZ, G., CURR. OPIN, IN BIOTECH., (1997), vol. 8, page 467 | - TUCKERMANN, J. ET AL., CELL, (1998), vol. 93, page 531 | - REICHARDT, HM, EMBO J., (2001), vol. 20, page 7168 | - JACKSON ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM., (2002), vol. 12, pages 1093 - 1097 | - FUKUMI ET AL., HETEROCYCLES, (1978), vol. 9, no. 9, pages 1197 - 1205 | - SIMCHEN ET AL., JUSTUS LIEBIGS ANN. CHEM., (1974), pages 1802 - 1812 | - PLIENINGER ET AL., CHEM. BER., (1964), vol. 97, pages 667 - 681 | - MIRAK ET AL., TET. LETT., (1970), pages 1209 - 1212 | - LASZLO ET AL., HUNG. ACTA CHIM. HUNGARICA, (1985), vol. 120, no. 4, pages 271 - 274 | - NAZAKI ET AL., BULL. CHEM. SOC. JAP., (1975), vol. 48, no. 11, pages 3278 - 3284 | - BARRISH ET AL., BIOMED. CHEM., (1993), vol. 1, no. 4, pages 309 - 325 | - PETRZILKA, "Preparation and Diels-Alder Reactions of Hetero-Substituted 1,3-Dienes", SYNTHESIS, (1981), pages 753 - 786 | - SUNDBERG ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1981), vol. 46, page 4836 | - FOWLER, F., J. ORG. CHEM., (1972), vol. 37, no. 9, pages 1321 - 1323 | - DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, (1999), vol. 24, pages 425 - 430 | US19980175180 | US20020396907 |