EP1708840 - ZERO CENTERLINE TOOLHOLDER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KENNAMETAL INC. 1600 Technology Way Latrobe, PA 15650 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/41] | For all designated states Kennametal, Inc. P.O. Box 231, 1600 Technology Way Latrobe, PA 15650-0231 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERICKSON, Robert, A. 1005 Pebblebrook Drive Raleigh, NC 27609 / US | [2006/41] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Prinz & Partner Patentanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/41] | Kitzhofer, Thomas Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05705908.1 | 14.01.2005 | [2006/41] | WO2005US01684 | Priority number, date | US20040766396 | 28.01.2004 Original published format: US 766396 | [2006/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005072896 | Date: | 11.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1708840 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B23B31/16 | [2006/41] | CPC: |
B23B1/00 (EP,US);
B23B31/16 (KR);
B23B27/16 (EP,US);
B23B31/10 (KR);
B23B2200/28 (EP,US);
Y10T82/2508 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WERKZEUGHALTERANORDNUNG MIT NULL-MITTELLINIE | [2006/41] | English: | ZERO CENTERLINE TOOLHOLDER ASSEMBLY | [2006/41] | French: | ENSEMBLE PORTE-OUTIL A AXE NUL | [2006/41] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 26.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 21.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/20] | 24.11.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.12.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1158378 (YAMAZAKI MAZAK CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9-11 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,4,5 *; | [X]EP1168125 (YAMAZAKI MAZAK CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3-5,7-9,11,12 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,4 *; | [A]EP1366851 (YAMAZAKI MAZAK CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12 * column 1, paragraph 1 ** figures 1-18 * | International search | [X]US6453782 (YAMAZAKI TSUNEHIKO [JP], et al) | Examination | - Metalworking products, turning tools, Sweden, Sandvik Coromant AB, (200001), p. A 74, A 75, A 98, A 105 | by applicant | EP1168125 | EP1158378 |