EP1722872 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF MEASURING AND EVALUATING PERFORMANCE OF A PHYSICAL SKILL AND EQUIPMENT USED TO PERFORM THE PHYSICAL SKILL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2011 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 09.02.2011 [2011/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Modelgolf Llc 75 Federal Street 1320 Boston, MA 02110 / US | [2006/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANN, Ralph 7107 SW Wickiup Avenue Redmond, Oregon 97756 / US | [2007/41] |
Former [2006/47] | 01 /
MANN, Ralph 153 Tapatio Street Henderson, NV 89074 / US | Representative(s) | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP The Rectory 9, Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05706135.0 | 26.01.2005 | [2006/47] | WO2005US02732 | Priority number, date | US20040539385P | 26.01.2004 Original published format: US 539385 P | [2006/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005072831 | Date: | 11.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1722872 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A63B69/36 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
A63B24/0003 (EP,KR,US);
A63B69/3623 (EP,KR,US);
G09B19/0038 (EP,KR,US);
A63B2220/806 (EP,KR,US);
A63B2220/807 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG UND BEWERTUNG DER DURCHFÜHRUNG EINER KÖRPERLICHEN FERTIGKEIT UND ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DER KÖRPERLICHEN FERTIGKEIT VERWENDETES GERÄT | [2006/47] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF MEASURING AND EVALUATING PERFORMANCE OF A PHYSICAL SKILL AND EQUIPMENT USED TO PERFORM THE PHYSICAL SKILL | [2006/47] | French: | SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES POUR MESURER ET EVALUER LES PERFORMANCES OBTENUES LORS DE L'ACCOMPLISSEMENT D'UN EXERCICE PHYSIQUE ET CELLES DE L'EQUIPEMENT UTILISE POUR ACCOMPLIR L'EXERCICE | [2006/47] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 02.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/04] | 03.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/06] | 07.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]US5184295 (MANN RALPH V [US]) [DY] 1-26 * column A * * column 29, line 45 - line 65 * * column 31, line 1 - line 65 * * figures 14,16 *; | [X]US6514081 (MENGOLI JEFFREY L [US]) [X] 1-26 * column 2, line 14 - line 41 * * column 4, line 38 - line 58 * * column 5, line 16 - line 29 * * column 6, line 51 - line 54 * * column 7, line 8 - line 14 * * column 7, line 43 - column 8, line 18 *; | [Y]US2003054327 (EVENSEN MARK H [US]) [Y] 1-26 * paragraphs [0021] , [0027] , [0053] , [0054] , [0088] , [0089] , [0093] - [0097] *; | [Y]US2003109322 (FUNK CONLEY JACK [US], et al) [Y] 1-26 * paragraphs [0029] , [0037] , [0040] , [0103] * * figure 13 *; | [A]US2003219704 (BLECKLEY DELMAR [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * column A ** paragraphs [0012] , [0019] , [0020] * |